We think you have liked this presentation. If you wish to download it, please recommend it to your friends in any social system. Share buttons are a little bit lower. Thank you!
Presentation is loading. Please wait.
Published byBarrie Perry
Modified over 4 years ago
STEPS FOR MULTIPLYING A 2-DIGIT NUMBER BY ANOTHER 2-DIGIT NUMBER With Partial Products
Multiply with Partial Products STEP 1: Write one of the two digit numbers in your problem in expanded form and create two multiplication problems from it.
EXAMPLE: 4633 = 30 + 3 X 33 46 46 X 30 X 3 X 30 X 3
STEP 2: Solve the two multiplication problems.
EXAMPLE: 1 1 1 1 4646 4646 X 30X 3 1380 138 1380 138
STEP 3: Add the answers to the two problems together, making sure that you line up the place values correctly.
EXAMPLE: 1 1380 Partial Product 1380 Partial Product + 138 Partial Product 1,518 1,518
Multiplying by 10, 100 or 1000 x 100 = x 100 = x 100 = x 100 = x 100 = x 100 = C.
Equation Race Set 2 Distributive Property Solve your equation then add together your individual answers to get the final answer.
Arrays and Expanded Algorithm EQ: How can arrays help you multiply 2 digit numbers?
Addition Subtraction Multiplication Division
Multiplication Vocabulary Review.
1-digit by 4-digit Multiplication
Multiplication Mrs. Walker 4th Grade.
Multiplication. Multiplication is increasing the value of a number by adding in equal sets. 3 x 4 means add 3 together 4 times Multiplying.
PowerPoint A3 L4 Refine and use efficient written methods to multiply T U × T U.
Quadratic Expressions and Equations Expanding quadratic expressions using the grid method (C)
Partial Product (Multiplication Algorithm)
Partial Sums An Addition Algorithm.
Multiplication by multiples of 10 and 100 Objective to multiply numbers when 0’s are involved.
Multiplication is the process of adding equal sets together = 6 We added 2 three times.
Make sure yours is correct BEFORE you glue!!. any of the numbers that are added together a step by step solution to a problem the answer to a subtraction.
How to Multiply using Lattice. Step 1: How many boxes to you need? 23 X 5 You need 2 boxes on top and 1 on the side.
How to Multiply: Distributive x 62 x 60 x = 2790 Step 1: Multiply 45 by the expanded form of 62 (60+2). Step 2: Add together.
Everyday Mathematics Partial-Products Multiplication.
Multiplying by 2-digit factors Partial Products. How can we multiply 23 × 15 1.Draw a box and divide it into four pieces. 2.Write the value of each digit.
© 2020 SlidePlayer.com Inc. All rights reserved.