# How to Multiply: Distributive. 45 45 45 x 62 x 60 x 2 2700 90 31 2700 + 90 = 2790 Step 1: Multiply 45 by the expanded form of 62 (60+2). Step 2: Add together.

## Presentation on theme: "How to Multiply: Distributive. 45 45 45 x 62 x 60 x 2 2700 90 31 2700 + 90 = 2790 Step 1: Multiply 45 by the expanded form of 62 (60+2). Step 2: Add together."— Presentation transcript:

How to Multiply: Distributive

45 45 45 x 62 x 60 x 2 2700 90 31 2700 + 90 = 2790 Step 1: Multiply 45 by the expanded form of 62 (60+2). Step 2: Add together the products of 45x60 and 45x2 for the product of 45x62. A zero holds the ones place.

345 345 345 345 x 784 x700 x 80 x 4 241,500 27,600 1,380 241,500 + 27,600 + 1,380 = 270,480 12 3433 Step 1: Multiply 345 by the expanded form of 784 (700+80+4). Step 2: Add together the products of 345x700, 345x80, and 345x4 for the product of 345x784. Zeroes hold the ones and tens place.

Download ppt "How to Multiply: Distributive. 45 45 45 x 62 x 60 x 2 2700 90 31 2700 + 90 = 2790 Step 1: Multiply 45 by the expanded form of 62 (60+2). Step 2: Add together."

Similar presentations