Download presentation

Published byMikayla Arledge Modified over 3 years ago

1
**Multiplying a 3 digit number by a 1 digit number**

Using the grid method

2
**First, split the 3 digit number into hundreds, tens and units.**

For example; 642 is split up as 600, 4O and 2 289 is split up as 200, 80 and 9 356 is split up as 300, 50 and 6

3
**Then multiply the hundreds (600) by the number on the side (7):**

Then put the hundreds, tens and units into the top part of the grid and the number that you are multiplying by down the side of the grid. For example: 642 x 7: x 600 40 2 7 Then multiply the hundreds (600) by the number on the side (7): x 600 40 2 7 4200 Then multiply the tens (40) by the number on the side (7): x 600 40 2 7 4200 280

4
**And then multiply the units (2) by the number on the side (7):**

x 600 40 2 7 4200 280 14 Finally, add the 3 answers (4200, 280 and 14) together: 642 x 7 = = 4494

Similar presentations

OK

Multiplying by 10, 100 or 1000 x 100 = 1.48 148 x 100 = 7.74 774 x 100 = 4.42 442 x 100 = 8.55 855 x 100 = 3.56 356 x 100 = 5.74 574 01234 56789 100 C.

Multiplying by 10, 100 or 1000 x 100 = 1.48 148 x 100 = 7.74 774 x 100 = 4.42 442 x 100 = 8.55 855 x 100 = 3.56 356 x 100 = 5.74 574 01234 56789 100 C.

© 2017 SlidePlayer.com Inc.

All rights reserved.

Ads by Google

Ppt on online shopping mall Ppt on electricity for class 10th result Ppt on earth and universe Ppt on air pollution act 1981 Ppt on solid waste management in india Ppt on summary writing examples Ppt on art of war 3 Ppt on hydrogen fuel cell vehicles for sale Ppt on natural disaster in hindi language Ppt on product advertising photography