Download presentation

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Published byJoey Reede Modified over 2 years ago

1
Multiplication Practice Do you know how to multiply with double digits?

2
28 x 5 Lets try one together! Step 1 Multiply the numbers together that are in the ones place

3
4 28 x 5 0 Lets try one together! Step 1 8 x 5 = 40 I place the zero in the ones place and the four is carried and placed into the tens place I place the zero in the ones place and the four is carried and placed into the tens place

4
4 28 x 5 0 Lets try one together! Step 2 Multiply the number in the tens place with the number in the ones place.

5
4 28 x 5 0 Lets try one together! Step 2 5 x 2 = 10 When I multiplied I got 10 but I can’t forget about the 4 that I carried!

6
4 28 x 5 0 Lets try one together! Step 3 5 x 2 = 10 Now I need to add: 10 + 4 = 14 +

7
4 28 x 5 140 Lets try one together! Step 3 5 x 2 = 10 Now I need to add: 10 + 4 = 14 +

8
28 x 5 140 Lets try one together! Final Answer

9
Lets try 2 digit Multiplication Step 1 I start with the same step Multiply the numbers together that are in the ones place 32 x 16

10
Lets try 2 digit Multiplication Step 1 6 x 2 = 12 I place the two in the ones place and the one is carried and placed into the tens place. 1 32 x 16 2

11
Lets try 2 digit Multiplication Step 2 Multiply the number in the tens place with the number in the ones place. 1 32 x 16 2

12
Lets try 2 digit Multiplication Step 2 6 x 3 = 18 When I multiplied I got 18, but I can’t forget about the 1 that I carried! 1 32 x 16 2

13
Lets try 2 digit Multiplication Step 3 6 x 3 = 18 Now I need to add: 18 + 1 = 19 1 32 x 16 192 +

14
Lets try 2 digit Multiplication Step 4 “Monkey see, Monkey do” The monkey was watching you! All the steps you did with the number in the ones place, you repeat with the number in the tens place 32 x 16 192

15
Lets try 2 digit Multiplication Step 4 Before the monkey can repeat the steps he needs to put down his banana. In Math we use a zero, otherwise known as the placeholder. 32 x 16 192

16
Lets try 2 digit Multiplication Step 5 Multiply the number that is in the tens place with the number in the ones place. 32 x 16 192

17
Lets try 2 digit Multiplication Step 5 1 x 2 = 2 I place the two in the tens place next to the banana (zero). 32 x 16 192 2

18
Lets try 2 digit Multiplication Step 6 1 x 3 = 3 I place the three in the hundreds place next to the two. 32 x 16 192 32

19
Lets try 2 digit Multiplication Step 7 Now I need to add the products of my multiplication. 32 x 16 192 +32

20
Lets try 2 digit Multiplication Step 7 Add each number carefully, make sure you carry when you need to 2 + 0 = 2 9 + 2 = 11 3 + 1 + 1 = 5 32 x 16 192 +32 512 1

21
Lets try 2 digit Multiplication Final Answer 32 x 16 512

22
Practice Problems Get a scratch piece of paper and a monkey to help you with these practice problems 1. 21 x 15 = ? 2. 45 x 24 = ? 3. 67 x 31 = ? 4. 20 x 18 = ? 5. 16 x 45 = ?

23
Practice Problems Answers: 1. 21 x 15 = 315 2. 45 x 24 = 1,080 3. 67 x 31 = 2,077 4. 20 x 18 = 360 5. 16 x 45 = 720 Make up some of your own problems and check them with a calculator for even more practice!

Similar presentations

OK

How do I multiply a triple digit number by a double digit? 145 x 67 = ? 267 x 19 = ? I’m sure that you’ll agree that there are many methods that we can.

How do I multiply a triple digit number by a double digit? 145 x 67 = ? 267 x 19 = ? I’m sure that you’ll agree that there are many methods that we can.

© 2017 SlidePlayer.com Inc.

All rights reserved.

Ads by Google

Ppt on supply chain management of hyundai motors Ppt on solar power technology Skills ppt on leadership Ppt on planet mercury Training ppt on email etiquettes Ppt on role of mass media Ppt on bolivian water war Ppt on natural disaster flood Working of raster scan display ppt on tv Project report ppt on job satisfaction