We think you have liked this presentation. If you wish to download it, please recommend it to your friends in any social system. Share buttons are a little bit lower. Thank you!
Presentation is loading. Please wait.
Published byRalph Chafee
Modified over 2 years ago
Multiplying large numbers by splitting Created by: Sabrina Edmondson Adapted from BBC online
Multiplying large numbers by splitting Have a look at the following equation: 255 x 5
Multiplying large numbers by splitting First split the number into hundreds, tens and ones. 255 splits into 200, 50 and 5
Multiplying large numbers by splitting Then, multiply each of the numbers by 5. 5 x 200 = x 50 = x 5 = 25
Multiplying large numbers by splitting This method can be represented in a grid, as shown below.
Multiplying large numbers by splitting Finally, add the three numbers together to get your answer. ++
Multiplying large numbers by splitting So 255 x 5 = 1,275 Remember: check the answer by doing the opposite! 1,275 ÷ 5 = 255
Multiplying large numbers by splitting Now have a look at this equation: 255 x 25
Multiplying large numbers by splitting First split the number into hundreds, tens and ones. 255 splits into 200, 50 and 5 (these go along the top) 25 splits into 20 and 5 (these go along the sides)
Multiplying large numbers by splitting Then, multiply each number in the column by each number in the row. Have a look at the grid below.
Multiplying large numbers by splitting Add up each column, then add the resulting numbers together. ++
Multiplying large numbers by splitting So 255 x 25 = 6,375 Remember: check the answer by doing the opposite! 6,375 ÷ 25 = 255
Multiplying large numbers - lattice method Created by: Sabrina Edmondson Adapted from BBC online.
Long Multiplication What is long multiplication? A number multiplied by a 2 digit (or larger) number e.g. 25 x 13 Is there only one way to do? Are there.
Multiplying Large Numbers (Traditional Method) Created by: Sabrina Edmondson Adapted from BBC online.
MATHEMATICS Long Multiplication. The aim of this powerpoint is to teach you pencil & paper methods for multiplying large numbers together. EITHER Take.
Multiplying a 3 digit number by a 1 digit number Using the grid method.
Step 1: Place x 2 term and constant into the box 2x 2 2 PROBLEM: 2x 2 + 5x + 2.
Multiplying a 2 digit number by a 1 digit number Using the grid method.
STEP 1 Multiply the digits in the ones place. Write the product in the ones place of the answer box. If the product is greater than ten, carry the number.
Steps of Addition Move your mouse over each step to see the directions.
Multiplication methods. Multiplying Multiplication is mainly taught in three ways - the grid method, Chinese multiplication and traditional column method.
You have to pay £87 per week for your rent. You have to pay the rent for 51 weeks of the year. How much will you pay over the year?
Grid method for multiplying by a 1 digit number. 1.Firstly, write the multiplication sum and then draw the grid. The largest number goes at the top so.
Multiplying a 3 digit number by a 2 digit number Using the grid method.
MATHEMATICS Short Multiplication. The aim of this powerpoint is to teach you pencil & paper methods for multiplying large numbers by a single digit. EITHER.
Everyday Mathematics Lattice Multiplication Lattice Multiplication Everyday Mathematics Lattice multiplication involves: Using basic facts knowledge;
Multiplying Decimals Type your name and send: Next slide.
Create a grid. Write one factor (in expanded notation) along the top. Multiply each expanded number in the top factor by each expanded number in the.
Long Multiplication ÷ ÷ + ÷ ÷ + Using the ‘Grid Method’
Long multiplication – column method Example 87 × × Multiplying by 5 To multiply by 20, put the 0 in the units column, then multiply.
4,597, what does this number really mean? The 5 in the hundreds place means 5 x 100 4, The 5 in the tens place means 5 x
Where do we start? Top right 4 ones minus 7 ones Can’t do it! Take one ten away Tens place 2 Where do we get more ones? 1 ten + 4 ones = 14 ones.
SOLUTION EXAMPLE 1 Multiply one equation, then add Solve the linear system: 6x + 5y = 19 Equation 1 2x + 3y = 5 Equation 2 STEP 1 Multiply Equation 2 by.
Seek The Multiplication Treasure Copy this problem. Multiply the factors in the top row by the digit in the ones place in the second factor.
Dividing by 10, 100 and 1,000 Created by: Sabrina Edmondson Adapted from BBC online 6.3.
Solving by Elimination Example 1: STEP 2: Look for opposite terms. STEP 1: Write both equations in Standard Form to line up like variables. STEP 5: Solve.
Quadratic Expressions and Equations Expanding quadratic expressions using the grid method (C)
How do I multiply a triple digit number by a double digit? 145 x 67 = ? 267 x 19 = ? I’m sure that you’ll agree that there are many methods that we can.
Paper Power 1 (Multiplication) I am learning to work out multiplication problems using written working forms. 24 x
Multiplication -2D by 2D Kids Learning is Fun
Multiplying Binomials using the Grid Method Feb S. Calahan.
Multiplying by 10, 100 and 1,000 Created by: Sabrina Edmondson Adapted from BBC online.
Solve by using the ELIMINATION method The goal is to eliminate one of the variables by performing multiplication on the equations. Multiplication is not.
Equation Race Set 2 Distributive Property Solve your equation then add together your individual answers to get the final answer.
MULTIPLICATION. Meaning of Multiplication There are 5 packs. Each pack contains 6 cans of juice. How many cans of juice are there in all? To find how.
Lesson 4-8 Example Find the product of 231 and 7. Estimate first. Step 1 Estimate. 200 × 7 = 1,400.
1.3 Solving Systems by Substitution. Steps for Substitution 1.Solve for the “easiest” variable 2.Substitute this expression into the other equation 3.Solve.
Everyday Math Algorithms. Partial Sums An Addition Algorithm.
With Two-Digit Numbers. 1a. Multiply one’s column x 1 1 * 1 = 1.
Solve by using the ELIMINATION method The goal is to eliminate one of the variables by performing multiplication on the equations, and then add the two.
Jeopardy Solving Equations Add and Subtract Multiply and Divide Multi-Step Variables on each side Grouping Symbols $100 $200 $300 $400 $500 $100 $200.
Basic Column Addition. 1. Write out the numbers that are being added together below each other. When adding it doesn’t matter in which order you write.
How to Multiply using Lattice. Step 1: How many boxes to you need? 23 X 5 You need 2 boxes on top and 1 on the side.
Algebra B. Factoring an expression is the opposite of multiplying. a ( b + c ) ab + ac Multiplying Factoring Often: When we multiply an expression we.
Multiplication by multiples of 10 and 100 Objective to multiply numbers when 0’s are involved.
Lattice Multiplication A NEW way to Multiply By: Mrs. Overley 4 th Grade Math Teacher.
3.3 Solving Multi-Step Equations. A multi-step equation requires more than two steps to solve. To solve a multi-step equation: you may have to simplify.
Charts and diagrams Created by: Sabrina Edmondson Adapted from BBC online.
© 2017 SlidePlayer.com Inc. All rights reserved.