 # Lattice Multiplication Step-by-Step 356 * 25 = I don’t remember how to multiply!!!

## Presentation on theme: "Lattice Multiplication Step-by-Step 356 * 25 = I don’t remember how to multiply!!!"— Presentation transcript:

Lattice Multiplication Step-by-Step

356 * 25 = I don’t remember how to multiply!!!

HELP!!! I can help!! Let me show you how to do Lattice Multiplication.

356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 Make a grid the exact size of your problem. A 2 digit number times a 3 digit number gets a 2 x 3 grid. Draw a diagonal line in each box.

356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 Multiply 6 * 2 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet.

356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 Multiply 5 * 2 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet.

356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 6 0 Multiply 3 * 2 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet. Use a zero as a place holder.

356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 6 0 0 3 Multiply 6 * 5 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet.

356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 6 0 0 3 Multiply 5 * 5 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet. 5 2

356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 6 0 0 3 Multiply 3 * 5 and place the answer in the grid where the lines meet. 5 2 5 1

356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 6 0 0 3 Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 2 5 1 0

356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 6 0 0 3 Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 2 5 1 0 0 +1

356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 6 0 0 3 Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 2 5 1 0 0 +1 9

356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 6 0 0 3 Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 2 5 1 0 0 +1 9 8

356 * 25 3 5 6 2 5 1 2 0 1 6 0 0 3 Now add the diagonals and place the answer below the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal if you have a 2 digit answer. 5 2 5 1 0 0 +1 9 8

356 * 25 = 8,900 That is Soooo Cool!!! Thanks!

Download ppt "Lattice Multiplication Step-by-Step 356 * 25 = I don’t remember how to multiply!!!"

Similar presentations