 # 2-5 Example 2 Find the product of 87 and 39. Use the traditional multiplication method. 1. Estimate. 90 × 40 = 3,600 Lesson 4-13 Example 2.

## Presentation on theme: "2-5 Example 2 Find the product of 87 and 39. Use the traditional multiplication method. 1. Estimate. 90 × 40 = 3,600 Lesson 4-13 Example 2."— Presentation transcript:

2-5 Example 2 Find the product of 87 and 39. Use the traditional multiplication method. 1. Estimate. 90 × 40 = 3,600 Lesson 4-13 Example 2

2-5 Example 2 Find the product of 87 and 39. Use the traditional multiplication method. 2. Rewrite the problem in vertical format. 87 × 39 Lesson 4-13 Example 2

2-5 Example 2 Find the product of 87 and 39. Use the traditional multiplication method. 3. Multiply 9 times the digit in the ones column. 9 × 7 = 63 Write the tens digit above the tens column and the ones digit in the product under the ones column. 6 87 × 39 3 Lesson 4-13 Example 2

2-5 Example 2 Find the product of 87 and 39. Use the traditional multiplication method. 4. Multiply 9 times the tens column. 9 × 8 = 72 Add the 6 tens to get 78. 6 87 × 39 78 3 Lesson 4-13 Example 2

2-5 Example 2 Find the product of 87 and 39. Use the traditional multiplication method. 5. Multiply the value of the digit in the tens place times 7. 30 × 7 = 210 Write the hundreds digit above the hundreds column and the tens digit in the product under the tens column. 2 87 × 39 78 3 10 Lesson 4-13 Example 2

2-5 Example 2 Find the product of 87 and 39. Use the traditional multiplication method. 6. Multiply the value in the tens column by 30. 30 × 8 = 240 Add 2 tens to get 260. Write the 26 in the hundreds place. 2 87 × 39 78 3 2,6 10 Lesson 4-13 Example 2

2-5 Example 2 Find the product of 87 and 39. Use the traditional multiplication method. 7. Find the sum of the two products. 2 87 × 39 78 3 ______ ,393 + 2,610 Lesson 4-13 Example 2

2-5 Example 2 Find the product of 87 and 39. Use the traditional multiplication method. 8. The product is 3,393. Compare to your estimate for reasonableness. Lesson 4-13 Example 2

Download ppt "2-5 Example 2 Find the product of 87 and 39. Use the traditional multiplication method. 1. Estimate. 90 × 40 = 3,600 Lesson 4-13 Example 2."

Similar presentations