Download presentation

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Published byRuth Preston Modified over 9 years ago

1
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 327 2 8

2
327 2 8

3
0 6 327 2 8

4
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 327 2 8

5
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 327 2 8

6
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 327 2 8

7
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 1 6 327 2 8

8
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 1 6 5 6 327 2 8

9
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 1 6 5 6 Now add the diagonals 327 2 8

10
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 1 6 5 6 6 Now add the diagonals 327 2 8

11
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 1 6 5 6 6 6+5+4 = 15 327 2 8

12
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 1 6 5 6 65 1 327 2 8

13
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 1 6 5 6 65 1 1+1+4+1+4=11 327 2 8

14
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 1 6 5 6 6 5 1 1 1 327 2 8

15
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 1 6 5 6 6 5 1 1 1 1+6+2=9 327 2 8

16
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 1 6 5 6 6 5 1 1 1 9 327 2 8

17
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 1 6 5 6 6 5 1 1 1 90 327 2 8

18
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 1 6 5 6 6 5 1 1 1 90 Now read off the digits according to the diagonal place value columns 327 2 8

19
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 1 6 5 6 6 5 1 1 1 90 6 is in the ones column 5 in the tens 1 in the hundreds 9 in the thousands 0 in the ten-thousands 327 2 8

20
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 1 6 5 6 6 5 1 1 1 90 6 is in the ones column 5 in the tens 1 in the hundreds 9 in the thousands 0 in the ten-thousands So 327 x 28 = 9156 327 2 8

21
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 1 6 5 6 6 5 1 1 1 90 Now calculate 327 x 28 by another method. Can you see how your method is similar to this one?

22
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 1 6 5 6 6 5 1 1 1 90 Did you write out all 6 partial products separately? (like this) 327 x 28 56 160 2400 140 400 6000 9156

23
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 1 6 5 6 6 5 1 1 1 90 Did you write out all 6 partial products separately? (like this) Or did you use a condensed version? (like this) 327 x 28 56 160 2400 140 400 6000 9156 327 x 28 2616 6540 9156

24
Lattice multiplication (327 x 28) 0 6 0 4 1 4 2 4 1 6 5 6 6 5 1 1 1 90 Did you write out all 6 partial products separately? (like this) Or did you use a condensed version? (like this) Challenge: see if you can find each of the 6 partial products in the lattice multiplication! 327 x 28 56 160 2400 140 400 6000 9156 327 x 28 2616 6540 9156

Similar presentations

© 2024 SlidePlayer.com Inc.

All rights reserved.

To make this website work, we log user data and share it with processors. To use this website, you must agree to our Privacy Policy, including cookie policy.

Ads by Google