Download presentation

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Published byGeraldine Armstrong Modified over 8 years ago

2
By John Frezza Click here to begin slide show

3
76 15 ? 64 60 Difficult! Confusion! Too Hard ? ? ? ? ? Multiply Why! Help Me!

4
Multiplying two digit and three numbers can be a scary proposition for most children. By using either the partial product method or the lattice method it allows students to take a more organized, step by step approach! Either of these methods will ease the students apprehension and the best part is, students can choose the one they feel most comfortable with.

5
Lets begin with the partial products method.

6
Lets multiply 45 x 35

7
x Tens 30 Ones 5 40 5 By breaking down the numbers you are multiplying by place value the numbers become easier to manage. Then students can think in terms of multiplying using base 10 strategies.

8
Students can then make an easier calculation.

9
Once you have multiplied each number, it’s time to add the products. 1,350 + 225

10
= 1,575 Next you simply add the sums together and your answer is 1,575!

11
x Tens 60 Ones 2 40 Select one 5 You try the Partial Product Method 62 x 45 800 2,400 10 300 80 8,000 1,000100 200 30 First do 40 x 60, then 40 x 2 Followed by 5 x60, then 5x2

12
Sorry! …….Try Again

13
You’re Correct! x Tens 60 Ones 2 402,400 5 continue

14
x Tens 60 Ones 2 402,400 80 5 You’re Correct! continue

15
You’re Correct! x Tens 60 Ones 2 402,400 80 5300 continue

16
x Tens 60 Ones 2 402,400 80 5+ 300+ 10 You’re Correct! 2,700 90 + = 2,790 Now just add the products together Then add the sums Go to next slide!

17
Next, lets explore the lattice method using the same numbers, 45 and 35.

18
35 4 5 0 2 1 2 2 5 1 5 By breaking the numbers into these boxes the multiplication process becomes more manageable for students. Once you have completed the multiplication process, it’s then simply a matter of adding diagonally! 5 7 5 1,1,

19
You’re Turn! Try the lattice, you’ll love it 62 x 45 6 2 4 5 2 x 4 = 8 12 6 2 x 5 = 7 10 15 6 x 4 = 6 x 5 = 30 12 11 8 24 10 1st1st 3 rd 2 nd 4 th

20
NOPE! TRY AGAIN!

21
Very Good! 62 x 45 6 2 4 5 2 x 4 = 8 12 6 2 x 5 = 7 10 15 6 x 4 = 6 x 5 = 30 12 11 8 24 10 0 8 continue

22
Very Good! 62 x 45 6 2 4 5 2 x 4 = 8 12 6 2 x 5 = 7 10 15 6 x 4 = 6 x 5 = 30 12 11 8 24 10 0 1 continue

23
Very Good! 62 x 45 6 2 4 5 2 x 4 = 8 12 6 2 x 5 = 7 10 15 6 x 4 = 6 x 5 = 30 12 11 8 24 10 2 4 continue

24
Very Good! 62 x 45 6 2 4 5 6 x 5 = 3 0 2 0 4 1 8 0 You Are Ready to add!

25
Remember to add diagonally! 6 2 4 5 3 0 2 0 4 1 8 0 0 9 7 2, = 2,790 The answer is ! + + + + + + = = = =

26
In my experience, especially as a teacher of students with special needs, most students choose the lattice method to perform multiplication problems containing numbers with two or more digits. I believe this option truly lets the student take the number in smaller pieces and makes the operation more manageable for them.

Similar presentations

© 2024 SlidePlayer.com Inc.

All rights reserved.

To make this website work, we log user data and share it with processors. To use this website, you must agree to our Privacy Policy, including cookie policy.

Ads by Google