Download presentation

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Published byCaroline Moody Modified over 2 years ago

1
Multiplication Using the Lattice Method

2
What’s It All About? You are going to learn: How to multiply two whole numbers. What skills should you have already? You need to be able to multiply up to 9 9 and add single digit numbers.

3
Multiplication Using Lattice Demo Calculate 572 × 14 Draw a box. You need three squares across and two squares down. Because 5 7 2 has three digits and 1 4 has two digits…

4
Cut each square diagonally in half. Write the numbers to be multiplied around the top and right edges. Use a highlighter pen to highlight every other diagonal stripe. 5 7 2 Multiplication Using Lattice Demo 1 4

5
Multiply the digits at the top and right of each cell and write the answer in the cell. 5 7 2 Multiplication Using Lattice Demo 1 4 0 5 0 7 0 2 0 2 8 0 8 Ten Thousands Thousands UnitsHundreds Tens The digits in each diagonal stripe all have the same place value...

6
Add up each stripe. Write the total for each stripe at the end of the stripe. 5 7 2 Multiplication Using Lattice Demo 1 4 0 5 0 7 0 2 0 2 8 0 8 Ten Thousands Thousands UnitsHundreds Tens Now we add up the digits, starting with the units corner...

7
Add up each stripe. Write the total for each stripe at the end of the stripe. 5 7 2 Multiplication Using Lattice Demo 1 4 0 5 0 7 0 2 0 2 8 0 8 0 8 0 8 0 1 1 Always write down your answer... 572 × 14 = 8008

8
Question 1 (with answer) Calculate 76 × 21 7 6 2 1 1 5 9 76 × 21 = 1596 1 4 1 2 0 7 0 6 6

9
Question 2 (with answer) Calculate 152 × 34 1 5 2 3434 0 3 1 5 0 6 0 4 2 0 8 0 5 68 1 1 152 × 34 = 5168

10
Question 3 (with answer) Calculate 237 × 14 2 3 7 1414 0 2 0 3 0 7 0 8 1 2 8 0 3 1 8 3 1 237 × 14 = 3318 1

11
Your Turn 1532 × 65 263 × 51 3234 × 97 4 7165 × 4 537 × 45 6103 × 54

12
End

Similar presentations

OK

Multiplying by 2-digit factors Partial Products. How can we multiply 23 × 15 1.Draw a box and divide it into four pieces. 2.Write the value of each digit.

Multiplying by 2-digit factors Partial Products. How can we multiply 23 × 15 1.Draw a box and divide it into four pieces. 2.Write the value of each digit.

© 2018 SlidePlayer.com Inc.

All rights reserved.

Ads by Google

Ppt on grease lubrication system Ppt on aircraft landing gear system diagrams Ppt on addition for class 3 Ppt on financial statement of sole proprietorship Ppt on rlc series circuit Ppt on cross-sectional study example Ppt on nature and humans Ppt on different types of computer softwares and hardwares Ppt on bio inspired robotics Ppt on as 14 amalgamation meaning