Download presentation

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Published byAshanti Barter Modified over 2 years ago

1
Multiply By Two Digits

2
Let’s Review Factors- Numbers multiplied together Product- The answer in a multiplication equation

3
23 x 12 Let’s estimate by rounding-

4
Two Digit Multiplication 23 x12 The first step is to make sure the place values are lined up. OnesTens

5
Two Digit Multiplication 23 x12 Begin with multiplying the bottom factor’s one’s place with the top factors one’s place. Think, 2 x 3 equals 6. 6 Circle the multiplier.

6
Two Digit Multiplication 23 x12 Next, multiply the 2 and the other 2. Think, 2x2=4 64

7
Two Digit Multiplication 23 x12 We are done with the first multiplier. Cross it out and circle the next multiplier (tens). 64 0 We need to use a 0 for a place holder. Place the 0 under the 6 in the products line.

8
Two Digit Multiplication 23 x12 Next, begin to multiply the 1in the tens place with the top line factor. Think 1x3=3. 64 03

9
Two Digit Multiplication 23 x12 Think 1x2=2. 64 032

10
Two Digit Multiplication 23 x12 Finally, add the two product lines to find the final product. 64 032+ 672 Add the ones place. Add the tens place. Add the hundreds place. 2 X 23= 46 10 X 23= 230

11
The product is 276

12
34 x 19 34 x 19 1. 656 2. 646 3. 677 4. None of these

13
Two Digit Multiplication 34 x19 60 0 43 + 646 3 3

14
54 x 23 54 x 23 1. 1,242 2. 1,244 3. 1,342 4. 1,142

15
Two Digit Multiplication 54 x23 26 0 8 10 + 242 1 1 1

16
41 x 18 41 x 18 1. 748 2. 778 3. 738 4. 728

17
Two Digit Multiplication 41 x18 82 0 1 4 + 837 3

18
68 x 35 68 x 35 1. 2,370 2. 2,345 3. 3,270 4. 2,380

19
Two Digit Multiplication 68 x35 04 0 4 20 + 083 4 3 2 2

20
76 x 52 76 x 52 1. 3,952 2. 4,952 3. 3,852 4. 3,552

21
Two Digit Multiplication 76 x52 25 0 0 38 + 259 1 1 3 3

22
94 x 76 94 x 76 1. 7,044 2. 7,144 3. 6,044 4. 6,244

23
Two Digit Multiplication 94 x76 46 0 8 65 + 441 2 5 7 2

Similar presentations

© 2017 SlidePlayer.com Inc.

All rights reserved.

Ads by Google