 # Worldwide Multiplication. British Multiplication Also known as: The Tower method.

## Presentation on theme: "Worldwide Multiplication. British Multiplication Also known as: The Tower method."— Presentation transcript:

Worldwide Multiplication

British Multiplication Also known as: The Tower method

46x37 46 x37 322 1380 1702 Work out 46x7 and write answer in columns Put a zero Then work out 46x3 Add down the columns Answer 1702 Mistakes Made by Students Basic multiplication is not strong enough Forget the zero or put it with the ‘322’ Answers not in columns so don’t add properly Find 6x7 then 4x3 and write answer as 1242 Many many more!!!

Chinese Multiplication A free download from www.emaths.co.uk Also known as: The Gelosia method The Lattice Method

46 × 37 Draw grid Draw lattice

46 × 37 46 3 7

46 3 7 1 8 6×3

46 × 37 4 6 3 7 1 8 6×7 4 2

46 × 37 4 6 3 7 1 8 4×3 4 2 1 2

46 × 37 46 3 7 1 8 4×7 4 2 1 2 2 8

46 × 37 46 3 7 1 8 4 2 1 2 2 8 Add diagonals

46 × 37 46 3 7 1 8 4 2 1 2 2 8 2

4 6 3 7 1 8 4 2 1 2 2 8 2 8+4+8=20 0 2

46 × 37 46 3 7 1 8 4 2 1 2 2 8 2 2+2+2+1=7 0 2 7

46 × 37 46 3 7 1 8 4 2 1 2 2 8 2 0 2 7 1

46 × 37 = 1702 46 3 7 1 8 4 2 1 2 2 8 2 0 2 7 1 Read off answer

Double 91 Half 73. Ignore any ½ s 7391 36 182 

Double 182 Half 36.

Double 364 Half 18

Double 728 Half 9. Ignore any ½ s

Double 1456 Half 4.

Double 2812 Half 2.

Cross out all the rows which have an even number in the left hand column

Add up the numbers remaining in the right hand column 91 + 728 + 5624

51×17 1×17=17 2×17=34 4×17=68 8×17=136 16×17=272 32×17=544 64×17=1088

51×17 1×17=17 2×17=34 4×17=68 8×17=136 16×17=272 32×17=544 64×17=1088 51 = 32+16+2+1

51×17 1×17=17 2×17=34 4×17=68 8×17=136 16×17=272 32×17=544 64×17=1088 51 = 32+16+2+1

51×17 1×17=17 2×17=34 16×17=272 32×17=544 17 34 272 544 867 +

Download ppt "Worldwide Multiplication. British Multiplication Also known as: The Tower method."

Similar presentations