Download presentation

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Published byPeter Lewis Modified over 8 years ago

2
Back to menu - St. Bartholomew’s C of E Primary School Parents Guide to maths + ÷ x Quit Multiplication AdditionSubtraction Division *Only click when prompted to ensure all steps are seen. Select an operation to become a maths wizard!

3
Back to menu Select a stage! ⋆ Addition - Stage 1 ⋆ Addition - Stage 2 ⋆ Addition - Stage 3 ⋆ Addition - Stage 4 Zap a stage!

4
Back to menu Select a stage! ⋆ Subtraction - Stage 1 ⋆ Subtraction - Stage 2 ⋆ Subtraction - Stage 3 ⋆ Subtraction - Stage 4 Zap a stage!

5
Back to menu Select a stage! ⋆ Multiplication - Stage 1 ⋆ Multiplication - Stage 2 ⋆ Multiplication - Stage 3 ⋆ Multiplication - Stage 4 Zap a stage!

6
Back to menu Select a stage! ⋆ Division - Stage 1 ⋆ Division - Stage 2 ⋆ Division - Stage 3 ⋆ Division - Stage 4 Zap a stage!

7
Back to menu + Addition ~ Watch and Learn! + Stage 1: slide 1 TU + U ______________________________ +1 2425 26 24 + 3 = +1 So 24 + 3 = 27 Put the largest number first +1 Then count on in units 27 Select a stage. See TU+ TU

8
Back to menu Begin by drawing a number line starting with the biggest number + Addition ~ Watch and Learn! + Stage 1: slide 1 TU + TU 22 + 33 = ______________________________ Next 33

9
Back to menu + Addition ~ Watch and Learn! + Stage 1: slide 2 TU + TU 22 + 33 = ______________________________ Next 33 +10 4353 Add 2 tens first T

10
Back to menu + Addition ~ Watch and Learn! + Stage 1- slide 3 22 + 33 = ______________________________ 33 +10 +1 43555453 Then add 2 units U So 22 + 33 is 55 55 Select a stage. See HTU+ HTU

11
Back to menu + Addition ~ Watch and Learn! + Stage 1: Slide 1 HTU+ HTU ______________________________ +100347 447 467 347 + 123 = +20 So 347 + 123 = 470 Add in steps of 100 first then the tens. +3 Then add away the tens. Then the units. Place the largest number at the beginning of the line. 470 Select a stage.

12
Back to menu + Addition ~ Watch and Learn! + Stage 2: slide 1 TU + TU 36 + 43 = (30+6) +(40+ 3) Start by partitioning the tens and the units. TU TU 30 + 40 6 + 3 Next

13
Back to menu 36 + 43 = (30+6) + (40+ 3) 30 + 40 = 70 6 + 3 = 9 Add the tens together and then the units. + Addition ~ Watch and Learn! + Stage 2: slide 2 TU + TU 70 + 9= 79 So 36 + 43 is 79 Select a stage. See HTU+ HTU

14
Back to menu 236 + 343 = (200+ 30+6) + (300 + 40+ 3) 200 + 300 = 500 30 + 40 = 70 6 + 3 = 9 Add the hundreds together and then the tens and units. + Addition ~ Watch and Learn! + Stage 2: Slide 1 HTU + HTU 500 + 70 + 9= 579 So 236 + 343 is 579 Select a stage.

15
Back to menu 47 + 76 = Next + Addition ~ Watch and Learn! + Stage 3: slide 1 TU+ TU Write the numbers so that the Tens and the Units are in line. T U 47 + 76

16
Back to menu 47 + 76 Start by adding the the units. 7 + 6 = U 13 Next Stage 3:slide 2 TU + TU + Addition ~ Watch and Learn! + 47 + 76 =

17
Back to menu 47 + 76 Next Stage 3:slide 3 TU + TU + Addition ~ Watch and Learn! + 110 Then add the tens. 40 + 70 = T 13 47 + 76 =

18
Back to menu 110 47 + 76 Stage 3: slide 4 TU + TU + Addition ~ Watch and Learn! + 13 123 Now add these together 110 + 13 = + So 47 + 76 is 123 47 + 76 = HTU + HTU Select a stage.

19
Back to menu + Addition ~ Watch and Learn! + Stage 3: slide 1 HTU + HTU 247 + 176 = 110 247 + 176 13 423 Set out as before. Add the units and tens as before and record. The extra step, add the hundreds together 200 + 100 = 300 Then add the numbers. + 300 So 247 + 176 is 423 Select a stage.

20
Back to menu 47 + 76 = Next + Addition ~ Watch and Learn! + Stage 4: slide 1 TU + TU 47 + 76 Write the numbers so that the Tens and the Units are in line. T U

21
Back to menu 47 + 36 = + Addition ~ Watch and Learn! + Stage 4: slide 2 TU + TU 47 + 36 Now add the units 7 + 6 = 13 U 3 units go in the units column 3 1 Next Exchange 10 units for 1 ten. This goes onto the door step.

22
Back to menu 47 + 36 = + Addition ~ Watch and Learn! + Stage 4: slide 3 TU + TU 3 1 Now add the tens 40 + 30 = 70 T Remember there is one ten here to add too. 7 tens + 1 ten = 8 tens You need to put the ten digit in the tens column 8 47 + 36 So 47 + 36 is 83 Select a stage. See HTU + HTU

23
Back to menu 147 + 186 = + Addition ~ Watch and Learn! + Stage 4: Slide 1 HTU + HTU 1 3 147 + 186 So 147 + 186 is 333 Select a stage. Carry any units over 9, any tens over 90. Remember to add the carry! 7 + 6 = 13 carry the ten 40 + 80 + 10 = 130 carry the hundred 100 + 100 + 100 = 300 1 33

24
Back to menu - Subtraction ~ Watch and Learn! - Stage 1: slide 1 TU-U ______________________________ 32 3130 32 - 3 = So 32-3 = 29 Remember to count back in 1’s Count back the correct amount of units e.g. 3 units = 3 jumps of 1. Place the largest number at the end of the line. 29 Select a stage. See TU-TU

25
Back to menu - Subtraction ~ Watch and Learn! - Stage 1:slide 1 TU - TU ______________________________ -1047 3727 47 - 23 = -10 So 47 – 23 = 24 Take away in steps of 10 first as this is easier. 23 = 2 tens. 2625 24 Then take away in jumps of 1. 3 units equal 3 jumps. Place the largest number at the end of the line. 24 Select a stage. See HTU-HTU

26
Back to menu - Subtraction ~ Watch and Learn! - Stage 1: slide 1 HTU-HTU ______________________________ -100 347 247227 347 - 123 = -20 So 347 – 123 = 224 Take away in steps of 100 first as this is easier. 123 = 1 jump of 100. -3 Then take away the tens. Then the units. Place the largest number at the end of the line. 224 Select a stage.

27
Back to menu - Subtraction ~ Watch and Learn! - Stage 2: slide 1 TU -TU 89 - 43 = 89 – 40 - 3 Start by partitioning the tens and the units. TU TU Next

28
Back to menu 89 – 43 = 89 – 40 - 3 89 - 40 = 49 49 – 3 = 46 Subtract the tens first. Then subtract the units from your first answer. - Subtraction ~ Watch and Learn!- - Subtraction ~ Watch and Learn! - Stage 2: slide 2 TU -TU So 89 - 43 is 46 Select a stage. See HTU-HTU

29
Back to menu 489 – 243 = 489 – 200 -40 - 3 489 - 200 = 289 249 – 3 = 246 Subtract the hundreds first. Then subtract the then tens from your first answer. Then the units - Subtraction ~ Watch and Learn! - Stage 2: slide 1 HTU - HTU So 289 - 243 is 246 Select a stage. 289 – 40 = 249

30
Back to menu 563 - 241 = Next - Subtraction ~ Watch and Learn! - Stage 3 :slide 1 500 + 60 + 3 - 200 + 40 + 1 Repeat with 241 Partition 563 into hundreds, tens and units.

31
Back to menu + 20 +300 Next, subtract the tens 60 – 40 = 20 563 - 241 = Next - Subtraction ~ Watch and Learn! - Stage 3: slide 2 500 + 60 + 3 - 200 + 40 + 1 Start with the units 3 – 1 = 2 2 UHT Next, subtract the hundreds 500 – 200 = 300

32
Back to menu - Subtraction ~ Watch and Learn! - Stage 3: slide 3 Add the answers together 300 + 20 + 2 = 322 - 200 + 20 + 2300 563 - 241 = 500 + 60 + 3 - 200 + 40 + 1 2 20 = 322 So 563 - 241 = 322 Select a stage.

33
Back to menu Next - Subtraction ~ Watch and Learn! - Stage 4: slide 1 Decomposition 137 - 85 = Write the numbers so that they are in place value position. 137 - 85 H T U

34
Back to menu Next - Subtraction ~ Watch and Learn! - Stage 4: slide 2 137 - 85 = 1 3 7 - 8 5 Subtract the units first. 7 – 5 = And write under the units. 2 The tens can’t be subtracted as 30 – 80 = - 50 Borrow 1 hundred from the hundred column. 0 1 Cross out the hundred and leave a 0 above. The 100 is put in the tens as a 1. The tens column now has 130 in it and the hundred has 0.

35
Back to menu - Subtraction ~ Watch and Learn! - Stage 4: slide 3 So 137 - 85 = 52 Now solve 130 – 80 and write the answer. There are 0 hundreds to subtract. 1 3 7 - 8 5 2 0 1 5 137 - 85 = Select a stage.

36
Back to menu x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x Stage1:slide 1 = 4 x 5 = 10 x 5 14 x 5 = Next Partition the 14 into 2 parts, tens and units.

37
Back to menu x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x Stage 1: slide 2 So 14 x 5 = 70 4 x 5 10 x 5 14 x 5 = = 50 = 20 Now add 50 + 20 and write the answer. Select a stage.

38
Back to menu Draw a box two across and one down because you are multiplying a 2 digit number by a 1 digit number. x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x Stage 2: slide 1 Grid Method 16 x 4 = Next 106 4 Partition 16 into 1 ten and 6 units

39
Back to menu The answer to 10 x 4 goes here. x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x Stage 2: slide 2 16 x 4 = 106 4 The answer to 4 x 6 goes here. x 4024 Now add these answers together. 40 + 24 = So 16 x 4 = 64 See TU x TU See HTU x U Select a stage.

40
Back to menu Partition 56 into 5 tens and 6 units x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x TU x TU slide 1 56 x 27 = Next 207 6 50 Partition 27 into 2 tens and 7 units

41
Back to menu The answer to 50 x 20 goes here. The answer to 6 x 20 goes here. x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x TU x TU slide 2 56 x 27 = 207 6 50 The answer to 50 x 7 goes here. 1000 350 The answer to 6 x 7 goes here Next x 12042

42
Back to menu x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x TU x TU slide 3 56 x 27 = 207 6 50 Add these four numbers together. 1000 + 350 + 120 + 42 = Children can use the addition methods to help them add. 1000 350 x 12042 So 56 x 27 = 1512 See HTU x U Select a stage.

43
Back to menu x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x HTU x U slide 1 126 x 4 = Next 10020 4 Partition 126 into 1 hundred, 2 tens and 6 units 6

44
Back to menu x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x HTU x U slide 2 126 x 4 = Next 10020 4 Partition 126 into 100, 20 and 6 6 4008024 The answer to 4 x 100 goes here. The answer to 20 x 4 goes here The answer to 6 x 4 goes here.

45
Back to menu x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x HTU x U slide 3 126 x 4 = 10020 4 6 4008024 Add 400 + 80 + 24 So 126 x 4 = 504 See TU x TU Select a stage.

46
Back to menu 38 x 7 = x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x Stage 3: slide 1 38 x 7 Set the sum out like this so that the numbers are in the correct columns. T U Next

47
Back to menu 38 x 7 = Next x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x Stage 3: slide 2 38 x 7 56 210 Multiply the tens by 7 7 x 30 = 210 Multiply the units by 7 7 x 8 = 56

48
Back to menu 38 x 7 = x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x Stage 3:slide 3 38 x 7 56 210 266 Now add these two answers together. 56 + 210. So 38 x 7 = 266 See TU x TU Select a stage.

49
Back to menu 15 x 24 = x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x TU x TU slide 1 15 x 24 Set the sum out like this so that the numbers are in the correct columns. T U Next

50
Back to menu 15 x 24 = Next x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x TU x TU slide 2 X 24 20 40 Multiply by the units 4 x 5 = 20 and 4 x 10 = 40 15

51
Back to menu 15 x 24 = Next x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x TU x TU slide 3 X 24 20 40 Multiply by tens 20 x 5 = 100 and 20 x 10 = 200 15 100 200

52
Back to menu 15 x 24 = x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x TU x TU slide 4 Now add these numbers together. So 15 x 24 = 360 X 24 20 40 15 100 200 360 Select a stage.

53
Back to menu 38 x 7 = Next x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x Stage 4: slide 1 38 x 7 Set the sum out like this so that the numbers are in the correct columns. T U

54
Back to menu 38 x 7 = Next x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x Stage 4: slide 2 38 x 7 Now multiply 7 x 8 = 56 and write the units and carry the tens onto the door step 6 5

55
Back to menu 38 x 7 = Next x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x Stage 4: slide 3 38 x 7 Now multiply 7 x 30= 210 and add the 5 tens to the 210 and which gives 260 write this, carrying the two hundreds onto the door step 6 5 6 2

56
Back to menu 38 x 7 = x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x Stage 4: slide 4 38 x 7 Now put the hundreds into the answer 6 5 6 2 2 So 38 x 7 = 266 Select a stage. See TUxTU

57
Back to menu 38 x 27 = x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x TU x TU – Zero the Hero 38 x 27 6 5 6 0 2 Set out as shown. First multiply 7 x 8 = 56. Carry the 5 tens and record the 6. Then 7 x 3 = 21 plus the 5 = 26 (record) Next place Zero the Hero into the units column. Now 2 x 8 = 16 Carry the 1 and record the 6. Now 2 x 3 = 6 and add to the 1 carry Nb. Each number is considered as a unit in this calculation to make it easier. eg. 30 is 3 and 20 is 2. 1 67 Next

58
Back to menu 38 x 27 = 38 x 27 6 5 6 0 2 Nb. Each number is considered as a unit in this calculation to make it easier. eg. 30 is 3 and 20 is 2. 1 67 x Multiplication ~ Watch and Learn! x TU x TU – Zero the Hero Finally add 266 and 760. 6201 So 38 x 27 = 1026 11 Select a stage.

59
Back to menu How many 6s make 30? Well I know that 2 x 6 = 12 Stage 1: slide 1 Repeated subtraction 24 ÷ 3 = 0 Jump back in 3s (the divider) until no more can be taken. 24 18 21 ÷ Division ~ Watch and Learn! ÷ Write the number to divide at the end of a number line. 1512963 -3 Now count the number of jumps. 8 jumps So 24 ÷ 3 = 8 -3 Select a stage. See remainders

60
Back to menu How many 6s make 30? Well I know that 2 x 6 = 12 Stage 1: slide 2 Repeated subtraction 25 ÷ 3 = 1 Jump back in 3s (the divider) until no more can be taken or you reach 25 1922 ÷ Division ~ Watch and Learn! ÷ Write the number to divide at the end of a number line. 161310 7 4 -3 Now count the number of jumps. 8 jumps. You are left with 1 So 24 ÷ 3 = 8 r 1 -3 Select a stage. 0 See Partitioning

61
Back to menu ÷ Division ~ Watch and Learn! ÷ Stage1:slide 3 = 3 ÷ 3 = 60 ÷ 3 63 ÷ 3 = Next Partition the 63 into 2 parts, tens and units.

62
Back to menu Stage 1: slide 2 So 63 ÷ 3 = 21 3 ÷ 3 60 ÷ 3 63 ÷ 3 = = 20 = 1 Now add 20 + 1 and write the answer. Select a stage. ÷ Division ~ Watch and Learn! ÷

63
Back to menu 63 ÷ 3 = Next ÷ Division ~ Watch and Learn! ÷ 3 63 Stage 2: slide 1- chunking Two ways to set out or

64
Back to menu Children will look for chunks. First take chunks (multiples) of 10,then 5 and then single units until you have the divided number - 63 63 ÷ 3 = ÷ Division ~ Watch and Learn! ÷ 3 63 30 + 30 + 3 = 63 so we have taken all chunks possible. Stage 2: slide 2 30 (3 x 10) 3 (3 x 1) Add the chunks. 10 + 10 + 1 = 21 So 63 ÷ 3 = 21 21 Select a stage.

65
Back to menu ÷ Division ~ Watch and Learn! ÷ Stage 3: slide 1– Long division Next So 198 ÷ 6 = 33 6 198 Children will look for chunks. Try to use multiples of 10, 20, 30 etc to remove the largest possible multiple of 6. (6 x 30)- 180 Record the chunk in brackets and put the answer underneath the original number. Subtract the chunk from the divided number. Then look for more chunks. 18 - 18(6 x 3) 0 Once all chunks have been taken and 0 or a remainder is left, show the answer at the top by adding the chunks. 30 + 3 = 33 33

66
Back to menu ÷ Division ~ Watch and Learn! ÷ Stage 3: slide 2 With remainders HTU ÷ TU So 560 ÷ 24 = 23 r 8 24 560 Children will look for chunks. Try to use multiples of 10, 20, 30 etc to remove the largest possible multiple of 24. (24 x 20)- 480 Record the chunk in brackets and put the answer underneath the original number. Subtract the chunk from the divided number. Then look for more chunks. 80 - 72(24 x 3) 8 Once all chunks have been taken and 0 or a remainder is left, show the answer at the top by adding the chunks. There is not enough to make another 24 so there is a remainder of 8. 20 + 3 = 23 r 8 23 r 8 Select a stage.

67
Back to menu ÷ Division ~ Watch and Learn! ÷ Stage 4: slide 1 short division 3 8 1 Regard each digit on its own. Work from left to right. How many 3’s are in 8? Mental Working 2 with 2 remaining. Record the 2 above the line. Then carry the remaining 2 over. 2 2 Record the 2 next to the one making 21. How many 3’s in 21 = 7. Record above the 21. 7 So 81 ÷ 3 = 27 81 ÷ 3 = Next

68
Back to menu ÷ Division ~ Watch and Learn! ÷ Stage 4: slide 2 ~ With remainders 12 2 2 4 Regard each digit on its own. Work from left to right. How many 12s are in 2? Mental Working 0 with 2 remaining. Record the 0 above the line. Then carry the remaining 2 over. 0 2 Record the 2 next to the two making 22. How many 12s in 22 = 1 – Record above the 22. 1 So 224 ÷ 12 = 18 r8 224 ÷ 12 = 10 8 r 8 Carry the 10 and record how many 12s in 104. Record the 8 and remember the 8 remaining. Next

69
Back to menu ÷ Division ~ Watch and Learn! ÷ Stage 4: slide 3 ~ With decimals 4 2 5 0 How many 4s are in 2? Mental Working 0 with 2 remaining. Record the 0 above the line. Then carry the remaining 2 over making 25. 0 2 How many 4s in 25 = 6 with 1 remainder. Record above the 25. 6 So 250 ÷ 4 = 62.5 250 ÷ 4 = 1 2 Carry the 1 and record how many 4s in 10 = 2 with 2 remaining. Now add a decimal point and carry the 2 making 20. Select a stage.. 0. 5 2 How many 4s in 20 = 5. Record above Only record to a maximum of 2 decimal places.

Similar presentations

© 2024 SlidePlayer.com Inc.

All rights reserved.

To make this website work, we log user data and share it with processors. To use this website, you must agree to our Privacy Policy, including cookie policy.

Ads by Google