Download presentation

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Published byOphelia Wood Modified over 4 years ago

1
Lesson 4-13 Example 1 2-5 Example 1 Find the product of 27 and 52. Use the partial products method. 1.Rewrite the problem in vertical format. 52 × 27

2
Lesson 4-13 Example 1 2-5 Example 1 Find the product of 27 and 52. Use the partial products method. 2.Multiply 7 times the number in the ones column. 7 × 2 = 14 52 × 27 14

3
Lesson 4-13 Example 1 2-5 Example 1 Find the product of 27 and 52. Use the partial products method. 3.Multiply 7 times the number in the tens column. 7 × 50 = 350 52 × 27 14 350

4
Lesson 4-13 Example 1 2-5 Example 1 Find the product of 27 and 52. Use the partial products method. 4.Multiply 20 times the number in the ones column. 20 × 2 = 40 52 × 27 14 350 40

5
Lesson 4-13 Example 1 2-5 Example 1 Find the product of 27 and 52. Use the partial products method. 5.Multiply 20 times the number in the tens column. 20 × 50 = 1,000 52 × 27 14 350 40 1,000

6
Lesson 4-13 Example 1 2-5 Example 1 Find the product of 27 and 52. Use the partial products method. 6.Add the partial products. 14 + 350 + 40 + 1,000 = 1,404 52 × 27 14 350 40 1,000 1,404

7
Lesson 4-13 Example 1 2-5 Example 1 Find the product of 27 and 52. Use the partial products method. 7.The product is 1,404.

Similar presentations

© 2020 SlidePlayer.com Inc.

All rights reserved.

To make this website work, we log user data and share it with processors. To use this website, you must agree to our Privacy Policy, including cookie policy.

Ads by Google