Download presentation

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Published byJames Bennett Modified over 8 years ago

2
Partial Products Multiplication Step by Step

3
742 X 29 742=700+40+2 Expand each number.

4
742=700+40+2 29 = 20+9 Expand each number. 742 x 29

5
742=700+40+2 29 = 20+9 Multiply 700 x 20. 742 x 29 700 x 20 = 14000

6
742=700+40+2 29 = 20+9 Multiply 700 x 9. 742 x 29 700 x 20 = 14000 700 x 9 = 6300

7
742=700+40+2 29 = 20+9 Multiply 40 x 20. 742 x 29 700 x 20 = 14000 700 x 9 = 6300 40 x 20 = 800

8
742=700+40+2 29 = 20+9 Multiply 40 x 9. 742 x 29 700 x 20 = 14000 700 x 9 = 6300 40 x 20 = 800 40 x 9 = 360

9
742=700+40+2 29 = 20+9 Multiply 2 x 20. 742 x 29 700 x 20 = 14000 700 x 9 = 6300 40 x 20 = 800 40 x 9 = 360 2 x 20 = 40

10
742=700+40+2 29 = 20+9 Multiply 2 x 9. 742 x 29 700 x 20 = 14000 700 x 9 = 6300 40 x 20 = 800 40 x 9 = 360 2 x 20 = 40 2 x 9 = 18

11
742=700+40+2 29 = 20+9 Now, add all you products. 742 x 29 700 x 20 = 14000 700 x 9 = 6300 40 x 20 = 800 40 x 9 = 360 2 x 20 = 40 2 x 9 = + 18 21,518

12
742 x 29 = 21,518

13
What if there are decimals in the problem???

14
If your problem has decimals in it, just count the number of digits behind the decimal points in your problem and put that many digits behind the decimal in your answer.

15
What if there are decimals in the problem??? If your problem has decimals in it, just count the number of digits behind the decimal points in your problem and put that many digits behind the decimal in your answer. 35.4 * 3.42 = 121068

16
What if there are decimals in the problem??? If your problem has decimals in it, just count the number of digits behind the decimal points in your problem and put that many digits behind the decimal in your answer. 35.4 * 3.42 = 121068 Where do I put my decimal?

17
What if there are decimals in the problem??? If your problem has decimals in it, just count the number of digits behind the decimal points in your problem and put that many digits behind the decimal in your answer. 35.4 * 3.42 = 121068 Where do I put my decimal? 35.4 * 3.42 = 121068 I have 3 digits behind decimals in my problem..

18
What if there are decimals in the problem??? If your problem has decimals in it, just count the number of digits behind the decimal points in your problem and put that many digits behind the decimal in your answer. 35.4 * 3.42 = 121068 Where do I put my decimal? 35.4 * 3.42 = 121068 I have 3 digits behind decimals in my problem.. So I will have 3 digits behind the decimal in my answer!!! 35.4 * 3.42 = 121.068

19
Cool man!! I can’t believe it’s so easy!!!!!!!!!!!

Similar presentations

© 2024 SlidePlayer.com Inc.

All rights reserved.

To make this website work, we log user data and share it with processors. To use this website, you must agree to our Privacy Policy, including cookie policy.

Ads by Google