Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

LO: I can multiply a two digit number by another two digit number using the Grid Method. 17/04/2014.

Similar presentations


Presentation on theme: "LO: I can multiply a two digit number by another two digit number using the Grid Method. 17/04/2014."— Presentation transcript:

1 LO: I can multiply a two digit number by another two digit number using the Grid Method. 17/04/2014

2 Can you work this out by using the grid method? 73 x 58=

3 Did you get it right? X703 503500150 856024 3650 + 584 4234

4 If no, here is a recap..! 25 x 35= 20 + 5 30 + 5 X205 30 5

5 If no, here is a recap..! 25 x 35= X20205 3030 5 660015150 1010025

6 What next? 25 x 35= X205 30600150 510025 600 150 100 + 25 5 78

7 Try this one… Use the Grid Method of multiplication to work out this question… 71 x 43 =

8 X701 40 3 28280040 212103

9 71 x 43 = X701 40 3 28280040 212103 2800 210 40 + 3 2000 (2000 + 0) 1000 (800 + 200) 50 (10 + 40) + 3 (3 + 0) 3053

10 LO: I can multiply a two digit number by another two digit number using the Grid Method. Section A Section B Section C Q1) 92x50=Q1) 92x139=Q1)155x497= Q2)18x98=Q2)87x166=Q2)119x517= Q3)17x87=Q3)82x185=Q3)101x227= Q4)58x39=Q4)66x158=Q4)109x141= Q5)53x44=Q5)46x136=Q5)122x642= Q6)22x70=Q6)28x102=Q6)114x363= Q7)51x32=Q7)93x165=Q7)180x301= Q8)43x71=Q8)99x151=Q8)169x316= Q9)93x68=Q9)64x191=Q9)109x578= Q10) 21x53=Q10) 21x117=Q10)116x197= Q11)157x367= Section D Q12)188x176= Q1) A baker bakes twenty doughnuts per day, how many does he bake in a 2weeks? Q13)175x258= Q2) Sam bought 138 rolls of paper. Each roll was 34m long. How long is it altogether? Q14)121x417= Q3) Tom collected 57 stamps a week for 2 years. How many stamps did he collect? Q15)159x378= Q4) Niamh eats 246 apples a year. How many does she eat in twelve years? Q16)150x533= Q5) A Garden is 20m wide and its length is 187m. What is its total area? Q17)132x126= Q6) Mr Senior swims 48 lengths a week, how many lengths does he swim a year? Q18)120x538= Q7) If Fanta is packed in boxes of 67, how many cans will there be in 25 boxes? Q19)145x601= Q8) Mrs Haddleton runs 12 laps of the field a week. How many laps in 3.5 years? Q20) 152x922=

11 Answer Key Section A Section B Section C Q1)92x50=4600Q1)92x139=12788Q1)155x497=77035 Q2)18x98=1764Q2)87x166=14442Q2)119x517=61523 Q3)17x87=1479Q3)82x185=15170Q3)101x227=22927 Q4)58x39=2262Q4)66x158=10428Q4)109x141=15369 Q5)53x44=2332Q5)46x136=6256Q5)122x642=78324 Q6)22x70=1540Q6)28x102=2856Q6)114x363=41382 Q7)51x32=1632Q7)93x165=15345Q7)180x301=54180 Q8)43x71=3053Q8)99x151=14949Q8)169x316=53404 Q9)93x68=6324Q9)64x191=12224Q9)109x578=63002 Q10)21x53=1113Q10)21x117=2457Q10)116x197=22852 Q11)157x367=57619 Section D Q12)188x176=33088 Q1)20 x 14 =280Q13)175x258=45150 Q2)138 x 34 =4692Q14)121x417=50457 Q3)57 x (52 x 2) =5928Q15)159x378=60102 Q4)246 x 12 =2952Q16)150x533=79950 Q5)187 x 20 =3740Q17)132x126=16632 Q6)48 x 52 =2496Q18)120x538=64560 Q7)67 x 25 =1675Q19)145x601=87145 Q8)12 x 182 =2184 Q20) 152x922=140144

12 Can you multiply three digit numbers? How would you set this one out? 124 x 45 =

13 X100204 404000800160 550010020 4000 800 160 500 100 + 20 4000 (4000 + 0) 1500 (800+100+100+500) + 80 (60+20) 5580

14 Assessment Using the Grid Method of multiplication, work out the answer to these: 1. 46 x 25 2. 560 x 28 3. 245 x 152

15 Assessment Answers Q1406 20800120 520030 800 120 200 30 1150 Q250060 20100001200 84000480 10000 1200 4000 480 15680 Q3200405 100200004000500 50100002000250 24008010 20000 4000 500 10000 2000 250 400 80 10 37240


Download ppt "LO: I can multiply a two digit number by another two digit number using the Grid Method. 17/04/2014."

Similar presentations


Ads by Google