Download presentation

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Published byAudra Conley Modified over 8 years ago

2
100

4
Solve 3 X 7 = ? using base 10 blocks Build a 3 X 7 array! X

5
Solve 3 X 7 = using base 10 blocks Build a 3 X 7 array! How many blocks are in your array? So 3 x 7 = 21. 21 X

7
X Solve 60 X 50 = using base 10 blocks Build a 60 X 50 array! Try to use as FEW blocks as possible. (Trade sets of 10 longs for 1 flat.)

8
How many blocks are in your array? So 60 x 50 = 3,000. 3,000 X 100

10
X Solve 67 X 53 = using base 10 blocks Build a 67 X 53 array! Try to use as FEW blocks as possible. (Trade sets of 10 longs for 1 flat. Trade sets of 10 cubes for 1 long.)

11
X 100

12
How many blocks are in your array? So 67 X 53 = 3,551. 3,551 30 = 3,000 35 = 350 18 = 180 21 = 21 3,551

13
We call this method the Partial Products Algorithm. It looks like this…

14
Calculate 50 X 60 67 X 53 Calculate 50 X 7 3,000 350 180 21 Calculate 3 X 60 Calculate 3 X 7 + Add the results 3,551 To find 67 x 53, think of 67 as 60 + 7 and 53 as 50 + 3. Then, multiply each part of one sum by each part of the other. Now, add the results

16
Calculate 10 X 20 14 X 23 Calculate 20 X 4 200 80 30 12 Calculate 3 X 10 Calculate 3 X 4 + Add the results 322 #1 Build this with your blocks.

17
Calculate 30 X 70 38 X 79 Calculate 70 X 8 2, 100 560 270 72 Calculate 9 X 30 Calculate 9 X 8 + Add the results #2 Build this with your blocks. 3002

18
Now, try some in your Math Journal. You may still use the blocks or drawings of blocks.

Similar presentations

© 2023 SlidePlayer.com Inc.

All rights reserved.

To make this website work, we log user data and share it with processors. To use this website, you must agree to our Privacy Policy, including cookie policy.

Ads by Google