Download presentation

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

1
**Area Model for Multiplication**

2
43 x 27 = ? Break apart the numbers by place values Draw a rectangle and label the dimensions Multiply Then add the parts 40 3 40 x 20 = 800 40 x 7 = 280 3 x 7 = 21 3 x 20 = 60 1,161

3
Try Another One: x 45 Break apart the numbers by place values Draw a rectangle and label the dimensions Multiply Then add the parts 30 4 30 x 40 = 1200 30 x 5 = 150 4 x 5 = 20 4 x 40 = 160 1,530

4
**Do this one on your own: 26 x 78**

Break apart the numbers by place values Draw a rectangle and label the dimensions Multiply Then add the parts 20 6 20 x 70 = 1400 20 x 8 = 160 6 x 8 = 48 6 x 70 = 420 2,028 How did you do?

5
Area Model This method of multiplying supports students who are visual learners because they can easily see the “parts.” This method also supports student’s geometric knowledge of area.

Similar presentations

OK

We can multiply bigger numbers using an algorithm! www.classroom-teacher-resources.com.

We can multiply bigger numbers using an algorithm! www.classroom-teacher-resources.com.

© 2017 SlidePlayer.com Inc.

All rights reserved.

Ads by Google

Ppt on group development activities Ppt on internal auditing process Ppt on case study of nokia Ppt on various layers of the earth Ppt on diode Ppt on fibonacci numbers in music Ppt on save environment image Ppt on french revolution class 9 Ppt on acid-base titration lab report Ppt on amplitude shift keying modulation