Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Partial Products for Multiplication. Calculate 50 X 60 67 X 53 Calculate 50 X 7 3,000 350 180 21 Calculate 3 X 60 Calculate 3 X 7 + Add the partial products.

Similar presentations


Presentation on theme: "Partial Products for Multiplication. Calculate 50 X 60 67 X 53 Calculate 50 X 7 3,000 350 180 21 Calculate 3 X 60 Calculate 3 X 7 + Add the partial products."— Presentation transcript:

1 Partial Products for Multiplication

2 Calculate 50 X 60 67 X 53 Calculate 50 X 7 3,000 350 180 21 Calculate 3 X 60 Calculate 3 X 7 + Add the partial products 3,551 To find 67 x 53, think of 67 as 60 + 7 and 53 as 50 + 3. Then multiply each part of one by each part of the other and add the results. This is the distributive property.

3 Calculate 10 X 20 14 X 23 Calculate 20 X 4 200 80 30 12 Calculate 3 X 10 Calculate 3 X 4 + Add the partial products 322 Lets try another one.

4 Calculate 30 X 70 38 X 79 Calculate 70 X 8 2,100 560 270 72 Calculate 9 X 30 Calculate 9 X 8 + Add the partial products Do this one on your own. 3002 Lets see if youre right.

5 This method of multiplying supports students knowledge of the distributive property. Students must think about the value of each number and extend their use of the multiplication facts to multiples of ten. Students also increase their ability to use estimation and mental math. This method of multiplying supports students knowledge of the distributive property. Students must think about the value of each number and extend their use of the multiplication facts to multiples of ten. Students also increase their ability to use estimation and mental math.


Download ppt "Partial Products for Multiplication. Calculate 50 X 60 67 X 53 Calculate 50 X 7 3,000 350 180 21 Calculate 3 X 60 Calculate 3 X 7 + Add the partial products."

Similar presentations


Ads by Google