Download presentation

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Published byNoah Blair Modified over 3 years ago

1
Multiplication Using the Lattice Method including multiplication of decimals by estimation

2
What’s It All About? You are going to learn: How to multiply two whole numbers. What skills should you have already? You need to be able to multiply up to 9 × 9 and add single digit numbers.

3
Multiplication Using Lattice Demo Calculate 572 × 14 Draw a box. You need three squares across and two squares down. Because 5 7 2 has three digits and 1 4 has two digits …

4
Cut each square diagonally in half. Write the numbers to be multiplied around the top and right edges. Use a highlighter pen to highlight every other diagonal stripe. Multiplication Using Lattice Demo 4 5 7 2 1

5
Multiply the digits at the top and right of each cell and write the answer in the cell. Multiplication Using Lattice Demo 0 5 0 7 5 7 2 1 4 0 2 0 2 8 0 8 Ten Thousands Thousands UnitsHundreds Tens The digits in each diagonal stripe all have the same place value...

6
Add up each stripe. Write the total for each stripe at the end of the stripe. 5 7 2 Multiplication Using Lattice Demo 1 4 0 5 0 7 0 2 0 2 8 0 8 Ten Thousands Thousands UnitsHundreds Tens Now we add up the digits, starting with the units corner...

7
Add up each stripe. Write the total for each stripe at the end of the stripe. 5 7 2 Multiplication Using Lattice Demo 1 4 0 5 0 7 0 2 0 2 8 0 8 08 0 8 0 1 1 Always write down your answer... 572 × 14 = 8008

8
Question 1 (with answer) Calculate 76 × 21 7 6 2 1 1 5 9 76 × 21 = 1596 1 4 1 2 0 7 0 6 6

9
Question 2 (with answer) Work out 152 × 34 1 5 2 3434 0 3 1 5 0 6 0 4 2 0 8 0 5 68 1 1 152 × 34 = 5168

10
Question 3 (with answer) Calculate 237 × 14 2 3 7 1414 0 2 0 3 0 7 0 8 1 2 8 0 3 18 3 1 237 × 14 = 3318 1

11
Your Turn 1532 × 65 263 × 51 3234 × 97 4 7165 × 4 537 × 45 6103 × 54

12
Decimal Multiplication (one decimal number) Calculate 3.5 × 31 First step is identical to whole numbers. 3 5 3 1 1 0 8 3.5 × 31 = 108.5 0 9 1 5 0 3 0 5 5 1 What about the decimal point? 4 × 30 = 120 so the answer is about 120 1 0 8 5

13
Decimal Multiplication (two decimal numbers) Work out 15.6 × 7.4 1 5 6 7474 0 7 3 5 4 2 0 4 2 0 2 4 1 1 4 4 5 1 15.6 × 7.4 = 115.44 What about the decimal point? 10 × 8 = 80 20 × 8 = 160 so the answer is more than 80 and less than 160 1 1 5 4 4 1

14
Question 4 (with answer) Calculate 9.37 × 1.2 9 3 7 1212 0 9 0 3 0 7 1 8 0 6 1 4 1 1 44 2 1 9.37 × 1.2 = 11.244 What about the decimal point? 10 × 1 = 10 so the answer is about 10 1 1 2 4 4 1 1

15
Question 5 (with answer) Calculate 61 × 9.8 9 8 6 1 5 9 7 61 × 9.8 = 597.8 5 4 8 0 9 0 8 8 What about the decimal point? 60 × 10 = 600 so the answer is about 600 5 9 7 8 1

16
Question 6 (with answer) Calculate 7.5 × 0.3 7 5 0 3 0 2 2 7.5 × 0.3 = 2.25 0 2 1 5 5 What about the decimal point? 8 × 0.5 = 4 so the answer is about 4 2 2 5

17
153.4 × 65 26.3 × 6.1 32.34 × 45 41.65 × 4 53.8 × 4.2 61.03 × 5.6 Your Turn

18
End

Similar presentations

OK

Methods for Multiplying. Standard Algorithm Partial Products 12000800280 9006021 40 3 300 20 7 Draw table with dimensions of digits in each number. Ex.

Methods for Multiplying. Standard Algorithm Partial Products 12000800280 9006021 40 3 300 20 7 Draw table with dimensions of digits in each number. Ex.

© 2018 SlidePlayer.com Inc.

All rights reserved.

Ads by Google

Ppt on famous indian entrepreneurs list Ppt on airbags in cars Ppt on electricity from waste materials Ppt on taj mahal pollution Ppt on world mental health day Ppt on diode circuits and rectifiers Ppt on series and parallel combination of resistors in series Ppt on motivation in hindi Ppt on collections in c# Ppt on collection of data for class 11