Download presentation

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Published byEthel Allen Modified over 2 years ago

1
Making Your Students Feel Like A genius ( And maybe you )

2
What level of maths do I need to survive this session ?

3
If you understand your times tables can add and subtract one digit numbers Basic knowledge of fractions Can use a calculator (to check if you are really correct and smarter than you think) Want to learn Are willing to approach things positively DO I HAVE TO BE REALLY GOOD AT MATHS TO SURVIVE THIS CLASS ???

4
Think of a number Double it Add 14 Halve your answer Subtract the original answer Your answer is 7 Solve the answers

5
Write down a 3 digit number with digits decreasing, eg. 861 Reverse this number and subtract it from the first number Take this answer and add it to the reverse of the number Your answer is 1089 Solve the answers

6
Using 1089 from before multiply this by ANY 3 digit number How many digits in your answer ? Tell me any 5 of your digits Solve the answers

7
Write down any 2 1 digit number underneath each other and add them 8 times. Eg 1. 6 2. 5 3. 11 When you have done this add the 10 numbers up I need someone to write their number on the board Without the total. I will Guess the total before finish they are finished writing all the number up. Solve the answers

8
Write down any number from each of the 3 number sets ABC 857356462565 296641794581 458685442673 487496245625 765525957236 Select any digit from each of the select numbers and enter under Columns headed A, B or C Repeat this till all digits are used. Add up the new 4 3-digit numbers Answer for this total is 2528 Solve the answers

9
Multiplying 2 digit Numbers Eg. 11 13 x 12 x 13 13 2 16 9 ADD 11 plus 2 ( = 13) Multiply 1 x 2 ( = 2 ) ANSWE R

10
Multiplying 2 digit Numbers Eg. 17 19 x 13 x 19 2181 20 28 221 361 ADD 17 plus 3 ( = 20) Multiply 7 x 3 ( = 21 ) ANSWE R

11
Squaring a number ending in 5 Eg. 75 2 = 7 x 8 and 5 2 = 56 and 25 = 5625 (N5) 2 = n x (n+1) and 5 2 = n x (n+1) and 25 = n(n+1)25

12
Squaring a number between 30 and 70 Eg. 52 2 = 27 and 2 2 = 2704 [27 : 25+2] [04:2places for 4] 59 2 = ? 63 2 = ? 59 2 = 34 and 9 2 [34 : 25+9] [81:2places for 81] = 3481 63 2 = 38 and 13 2 [38 : 25+13] [169:2places for 169] 169 = 38 = 3969

13
Squaring a number between 30 and 70 Eg. 48 2 = 23 and 2 2 = 2304 [23 : 25-2] [04:2places for 4] 47 2 = ? 39 2 = ? 47 2 = 22 and 3 2 [22 : 25-3] [04:2places for 9] = 2209 39 2 = 14 and 11 2 [14: 25-11] [121:2places for 121] 121 = 14 = 1521

14
Squaring a number between 80 and 120 Eg. 103 2 = 106 and 3 2 = 10609 [06 : two x 3] [09:2places for 9] 107 2 = 11449 [14 : two x 7] [49:2places for 7x7] 109 2 = 11881 112 2 144 = 124 = 12544 ANSWER

15
Multiplying 2 numbers between 80 and 120 97 x 98 = 98 ( -2 : less than 100) 97 ( -3 : less than 100) = 9506 [95 : 97- 3 : 98 - 2] [06:2places for 6] 91 x 97 = 91 ( -9 : less than 100) 97 ( -3 : less than 100) = 8827 [88 : 91- 3 : 97 - 9] [27:2places for 6] 91 x 97 =

16
Multiplying 2 numbers between 80 and 120 107 x 112 = 107 ( 7 : morethan 100) 112 ( 12 : more than 100) = 11984 [19 : 7+12 : 12 + 7] [84: 7 x 12] 103 x 115 = 103 ( 3 : more than 100) 115 ( 15 : more than 100) = 11845 [18 : 3 + 15 : 15 + 3] [45 : 3 x 15] 103 x 115 =

17
Squaring a number between 80 and 120 Eg. 103 2 = 106 and 3 2 = 10609 [06 : two x 3] [09:2places for 9] 107 2 = 11449 [14 : two x 7] [49:2places for 7x7] 109 2 = 11881 112 2 144 = 124 = 12544 ANSWER

18
55 times 55 = ??? 55 2 = 5 x 6 and 5 2 = 30 and 25 = 3025

19
55 times 75 = ??? 55 x 75 = 5 x 7 + 6 and 5 2 = 41 and 25 = 4125

21
Multiplying 2 mixed numbers with the same units and fractions adding to 1 ANSWER

22
Multiplying a number ending in digits that add to 10 Eg 75 x 75 = 7 x 8 and 5 x 5 = 56 and 25 = 5625 (as before) 84 x 86 = ? 84 x 86 = 8 x 9 and 4 x 6 = 72 and 24 = 7224

23
Squaring 2 digit numbers Eg 73 2 = 76 x 70 + 3 2 = 5320 + 9 = 5329 or 73 2 = 70 2 +2(70 x 3) + 3 2 = 4900 + 2(210) + 9 = 5329 (ab) 2 = (a+b)(a-b) + b 2 or (ab) 2 = a 2 + 2(a+b) + b 2

24
Thank you and Have a great holiday

Similar presentations

OK

NUMBER SENSE AT A FLIP. Number Sense Number Sense is memorization and practice. The secret to getting good at number sense is to learn how to recognize.

NUMBER SENSE AT A FLIP. Number Sense Number Sense is memorization and practice. The secret to getting good at number sense is to learn how to recognize.

© 2018 SlidePlayer.com Inc.

All rights reserved.

Ads by Google

Ppt on save environment paintings Ppt on life without cell phones Free download ppt on solar system Ppt on brand marketing services Ppt on magnetic field due to current in a solenoid Ppt on economic growth and development in india A ppt on natural disasters Ppt on web designing software Ppt on sports day images Ppt on id ego superego freud