Download presentation

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Published byBilly Gascoyne Modified over 2 years ago

1
Math s How do we teach it? Why do we teach it like that? What do the written methods look like? What can you do at home to help?

2
How do our children learn in Maths lessons at Orleans? Encouraged to use mental calculation methods Practise recall of number facts to become quicker and more accurate They are more aware of the strategies they use to calculate Focus on correct use of vocabulary and talk for learning Real - life, contextual learning Practical and engaging lessons – fascinators ! CB ' s CB ' s

3
‘ I hear and I forget. I see and I remember. I do and I understand.’ ( A Chinese proverb ) ‘ It just doesn ’ t look like it did in my day.’

4
Until fairly recently, maths was taught using Victorian era methods. Were you one of the lucky ones? Logical and strong with numbers?

5
Vast numbers of clerks to perform calculations every day. Victorian Times Today, calculators and spreadsheets can do this car quicker, so the need for everybody to be able to do big calculations by hand has largely disappeared That ’ s not to say we don ’ t need strong number skills !

6
We are inundated by numbers all the time…

7
Probably not…but we do need to know that : 27 x 43 is roughly 30 x 40 and… that this is roughly 1,200 It ' s partly the need to have a good feel for numbers that is behind the modern methods. Do we all need to be able to work out 27 x 43 precisely with a pen and paper?

8
National Numeracy Strategy 1999 The revolution in the teaching of maths at primary school kicked in with this strategy. The emphasis moved away from blindly following rules ( remember borrowing one from the next column and paying back? ) towards techniques a child understood

9
The Aim for children to do mathematics in their heads, and if the numbers are too large, to use pencil and paper to avoid losing track. To do this children need to learn quick and efficient methods, including mental methods and appropriate written methods.

10
Mathematics is foremost an activity of the mind ; written calculations are an aid to that mental activity. Learning written methods is not the ultimate aim.

11
We want children to ask themselves : 1. Can I do this in my head? 2. Can I do this in my head with the help of drawings or jottings? 3. Do I need to use an expanded or compact written method? 4. Do I need a calculator?

12
A sledgehammer to crack a nut ! 1 0 0 0 - 7 9 9 3 10 1 1 9 9 16 - 9 7 0 1 97 x 100 00 000 9700 7 5 6 5 0 8 0

13
Additi on

14
Y 3 Programme : To add mentally combinations of 1- digit and 2- digit numbers Develop written methods to record, support or explain addition of 2- digit and 3- digit numbers Y 4 Programme : To add mentally pairs of 2- digit numbers To refine and use efficient written methods to add 2- digit and 3- digit numbers and £. p Addition – progression

15
How would you solve these? ● 25 + 42 ● 25 + 27 ● 25 + 49 ● 145 +127

16
Partitioning 48 + 33 40 8 30 3 70 + 11 = 81

17
Number line 242 + 136 = 378 242 342 + 100 + 30 +6 372 378 + 10 26 +1 36 +1 37 38 26 + 12 =38

18
Use the number line to work these out… 242 + 136 = 378 242 342 + 100 + 30 +6 372 378 67 + 48 = 346 + 237 = 3241 + 1471 =

19
Column Method 358 + 33 11 80 300 391 Leadi ng to 391 358 + 33 1 Expande d Compact

20
Subtra ction

21
Subtraction - progression Y 3 Programme : To subtract mentally combinations of 1- digit and 2- digit numbers Develop written methods to record, support or explain subtraction of 2- digit and 3- digit numbers Y 4 Programme : To subtract mentally pairs of 2- digit numbers To refine and use efficient written methods to subtract 2- digit and 3- digit numbers and £. p

22
67 - 45 ● 67 – 59 ● 178 - 99 ● 3241 - 2167 How would you solve these?

23
Number line Subtraction as taking away 30 – 17 = 13 30 15 20 - 5 - 10 - 2 13

24
5 12 Difference Subtraction as finding the difference

25
Number line Subtraction as finding the difference Jump to next multiple of 10 Count the jumps 10 + 4 + 2 = 16 34 – 18 = 34 18 2030 +2 + 10 + 4

26
Column Method 547 134 413 82 - 57 25 7 1

27
Use the number line to work these out… 48 – 31 = 256 - 167 = 34 18 2030 +2 + 10 + 4

28
Multipl ication

29
Y 3 Programme : Multiply one digit and two digit numbers by 10 or 100 and describe the effect ; Derive and recall multiplication facts for the 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, and 10 times tables ; Use informal and practical methods to multiply two digit numbers e. g. 13 x 3. Y 4 Programme : Multiply numbers to 1000 by 10 and then 100 and describe the effect ; Derive and recall multiplication facts up to 10 x 10; Use written methods to multiply a two digit number by a one digit number e. g. 15 x 9. Multiplication - progression

30
How would you solve these? ● 24 50 ● 24 4 ● 24 15 ● 136 9

31
Number line Multiplication as repeated addition 4 x 2 = 2 + 2 + 2 + 2 So, 2 x 4 = 8 0 24 4 x 2 68 +2

32
Arrays 3 x 6 A dd the dots Or

33
What multiplica tion are these arrays showing?

34
Partitioning 24 x 5 20 x 5 = 100 4 x 5 = 20 100 + 20 = 120

35
Grid Method 24 x 5 20 4 x 5 100 20 100 + 20 = 120 BBC News Video Link

36
Expanded Multiplicati on 38 x 7 210 56 266 (30 x 7) (8 x 7)

37
Use the grid method to work these out : 24 x 5 20 4 x 5 100 20 100 + 20 = 120 24 x 7 142 x 3

38
Divis ion

39
Y 3 Programme : Use practical and informal written methods to divide two - digit numbers ( e. g. 50 ÷ 4); Y 4 Programme : Develop and use written methods to record, support and explain division of two - digit numbers by a one - digit number, including division with remainders ( e. g. 98 ÷ 6) Division - progression

40
How would you solve these? ● 123 3 ● 165 10 ● 325 25 ● 623 24

41
Division

42
Arrays First group of 3 12 ÷ 3 = 4

43
Repeated subtractio n 0369 12 - 3 12 - 3 – 3 – 3 – 3 12÷ 3 = 4

44
Counting in steps 0369 12 12÷ 3 = 4 Add the jumps Fingers “6“6 “9“9 “12 ” “3”“3” + 3

45
Chunking 25 75 - 50 (10 x 5) 25 - 25 (5 x 5) 0 75 ÷ 5 = 15 75 ÷ 5 0 75 10 x 5 5 x 5 Need to know table s ! BBC News Video Link

Similar presentations

OK

We all use Maths all day everyday! We look at the clock to tell the time before we get out of bed. We estimate how far it is to the floor! We know how.

We all use Maths all day everyday! We look at the clock to tell the time before we get out of bed. We estimate how far it is to the floor! We know how.

© 2017 SlidePlayer.com Inc.

All rights reserved.

Ads by Google