# Example ( 1 ) : ( 1 2 ) 2 = - - - 1 2 + 2 = 14 ، 2 x 2 = 4 1 4 4 Example ( 2 ) : ( 1 3 ) 2 = - - - 1 3 + 3 = 16،3 x 3 = 9 1 6 9 Example ( 3 ) : (

## Presentation on theme: "Example ( 1 ) : ( 1 2 ) 2 = - - - 1 2 + 2 = 14 ، 2 x 2 = 4 1 4 4 Example ( 2 ) : ( 1 3 ) 2 = - - - 1 3 + 3 = 16،3 x 3 = 9 1 6 9 Example ( 3 ) : ("— Presentation transcript:

Example ( 1 ) : ( 1 2 ) 2 = - - - 1 2 + 2 = 14 ، 2 x 2 = 4 1 4 4 Example ( 2 ) : ( 1 3 ) 2 = - - - 1 3 + 3 = 16،3 x 3 = 9 1 6 9 Example ( 3 ) : ( 1 4 ) 2 = - - - 1 4 + 4 = 18 ، 4 x 4 = 16 1 9 6 Example ( 4 ) : ( 1 5 ) 2 = - - - 1 5 + 5 = 20،5 x 5 = 25 2 2 5 Square a Number مربعات الأعداد

Example ( 1 ) : ( 35 ) 2 = - - 3 x 4 = 12 ، 5 x 5 = 25 1225 Example ( 2 ) : ( 75 ) 2 = - - 7 x 8 = 56،5 x 5 = 25 5625 Example ( 3 ) : ( 125 ) 2 = - - 1 2 x 1 3 = 156 ، 5 x 5 = 25 15625 Example ( 4 ) : ( 15 ) 2 = - - 1 x 2 = 2،5 x 5 = 25 225

Example ( 1 ) : 1 3 x 1 3 = 1- square the first number 1 x 1 = 1 2- square 3 in the 133 x 3 = 9 3- know take 1x 3 = 3+3 (double) = 6 1 6 91 6 9 Example ( 2 ) : 7 2 x 7 2 = 1- square the first number 7 x 7 = 49 2- square 2 in the 72 2 x 2 = 4 3- know take 7x 2 = 14+14 (double) = 28 49 28 4 5184 Example ( 3 ) : 6 3 x 6 3 = 1- square the first number 6 x 6 = 36 2- square 3 in the 63 3 x 3 = 9 3- know take 6x 3 = 18+18 (double) = 36 36 9 3969 Example ( 4) : 5 4 x 5 4 = 1- square the first number 5 x 5 = 25 2- square 3 in the 54 4 x 4 = 16 3- know take 5x 4 = 20+20 (double) = 40 25 40 16 2916

Example ( 1 ) : ( 95 ) 2 = - - 95 - 5 = 90 ، 5 x 5 = 25 9025 Example ( 2 ) : ( 96 ) 2 = - - 96 - 4 = 92،4 x 4 = 16 9216 Example ( 3 ) : ( 85 ) 2 = - - 85 - 15 = 70 ، 15 x 15 = 225 7225 Example ( 4 ) : ( 88 ) 2 = - - 88 - 12 = 76،12 x 12 = 144 7744

Example ( 1 ) : ( 32 ) 2 = - - ( 30 + 2 ) 2 = Example ( 2 ) : Example ( 3 ) : ( 5 1 ) 2 = - - - ( 30 ) 2 = 900 2 x 30 x 2 = 120 ( 2 ) 2 = 4 1024 ( 74 ) 2 = - - ( 70 + 4 ) 2 = ( 70 ) 2 = 4900 2 x 70 x 4 = 560 ( 4 ) 2 = 16 5476 ( 50 ) 2 = 2500 2 x 50 x 1 = 100 ( 1 ) 2 = 1 2601

( a 5 ) 2 = - - - a 2 + a = - - - ، 5 x 5 = 25 --- 25 Example ( 1 ) : ( 35 ) 2 = - - - 3 2 + 3 = 12،5 x 5 = 25 1225 Example ( 2 ) : ( 45 ) 2 = - - - 4 2 + 4 = 20 ، 5 x 5 = 25 2025 Example ( 3 ) : ( 65 ) 2 = - - - 6 2 + 6 = 42،5 x 5 = 25 4225

Example ( 1 ) : ( 48 ) 2 = - - - Example ( 2 ) : Example ( 3 ) : Example ( 4 ) : Smarter way to square any number between 30 - 70 2 less than 50 25 – 2 = 23 square 2 = 4 23 04 2304 ( 46 ) 2 = 4 less than 50 25 – 4 = 21 square 4 = 16 21 16 2116 ( 37) 2 = - - - 13 less than 50 25 – 13 = 12 square 13 = 169 12 169 1369 ( 40) 2 = - - - 10 less than 50 25 – 10 = 15 square 10 = 100، 15 100 1600

Example ( 5 ) : ( 52 ) 2 = - - - Example ( 6 ) : Example ( 7 ) : Example ( 8 ) : 2 much more than 50 25 + 2 = 27 square 2 = 4 27 04 2704 ( 57 ) 2 = 7 much more than 50 25 + 7 = 32 square 7 = 49 32 49 3249 ( 60 ) 2 = - - - 10 much more than 50 25 + 10 = 35 square 10 = 100 35 100 3600 ( 65 ) 2 = - - - 15 much more than 50 25 + 15 = 40 square 15 = 225، 40 225 4225

Multiplying a number less than 100 by 99 99 x 98 = - - 98 - 1 = 97 ، 100 - 98 = 02 9702 Example ( 2 ) : 99 x 47 = - - 47 - 1 = 46،100 - 47 = 53 4653 Example ( 3 ) : 99 x 4 = - - 4 - 1 = 03 ، 100 - 4 = 96 0396 Example ( 4 ) : 99 x 17 = - - 17 - 1 = 16، 100 - 17 = 83 1683 Example ( 1 ) :

Multiplying a number less than 100 Example ( 2 ) : ، Example ( 3 ) : ، Example ( 4 ) : ، Example ( 1 ) : - 2- 3 97 – 2 = 95 ،2 x 3 = 6 9506 93 x 92 = - - - - 98 x 97 = - - - - - 7- 8 93 – 8 = 85 7 x 8 = 56 8556 87 x 91 = - - - - - 13- 9 91 – 13 = 78 13 x 9 = 117 7917 30 x 20 = - - - - - 70- 80 30 – 80 = - 5070 x 80 = 5600 5600 -50 600 ،

Multiplying a number between 11 to 19 Example ( 2 ) : Example ( 3 ) : Example ( 4 ) : Example ( 1 ) : 13 x 12 = 156 + x 19 x 15 = 145 + x 1 4 = 285 11 x 11 = 121 + x 17 x 13 = 101 + x 12 =221 Example ( 5 ) : 12 x 15 = 170 + x 1 = 180 Example ( 6 ) : 18 x 19 = 172 + x 17 =342 Example ( 7 ) : 12 x 12 = 144 + x Example ( 4 ) : 14 x 13 = 172 + x 1 =182

Example ( 1 ) : 3563 x 11 = - - - - Example ( 2 ) : Example ( 3 ) : How to multiply any number by 11 Copy the first digit3 3 + 5 = 8 5 + 6 = 11 6 + 3 = 9 At the end copy the last digit3 3 8 11 9 3 39193 4216 x 11 = - - - - Copy the first digit 4 4 + 2 = 6 2 + 1 = 3 1 + 6 = 7 At the end copy the last digit6 4 6 3 7 6 46376 21432 x 11 = - - - - Copy the first digit2 2 + 1 = 3 1 + 4 = 5 4 + 3 = 7 3 + 2 = 5 At the end copy the last digit 2 2 3 5 7 5 2 235752

Example ( 1 ) : 1332 x 12 = - - - - Example ( 2 ) : Example ( 3 ) : How to multiply any number by 12 Copy the first digit 1 Double ( 1 ) + 3 = 5 Double the last digit ( 2 ) 4 Double ( 3 ) + 3 = 9 Double ( 3 ) + 2 = 8 1 5 9 8 4 15984 3563 x 12 = - - - - Copy the first digit3 Double ( 3 ) + 5 = 11 Double ( 5 ) + 6 = 16 Double ( 6 ) + 3 = 15 Double the last digit ( 3 )6 4216 x 12 = - - - - Copy the first digit4 Double ( 4 ) + 2 = 10 Double ( 2 ) + 1 = 5 Double ( 1 ) + 6 = 8 Double the last digit ( 6 )12 3 11 16 15 6 42756 4 10 5 8 12 50592

Example ( 1 ) : 1332 x 13 = - - - - Example ( 2 ) : Example ( 3 ) : How to multiply any number by 13 Copy the first digit 1 Triple ( 1 ) + 3 = 3 + 3 = 6 Triple the last digit ( 2 ) 6 Triple ( 3 ) + 3 = 9 + 3 = 12 Triple ( 3 ) + 2 = 9 + 2 = 11 1 6 12 11 6 17316 12231 x 13 = - - - - Copy the first digit1 3 Triple ( 1 ) + 2 = 3 + 2 = 5 Triple ( 2 ) + 2 = 6 + 2 = 8 Triple ( 2 ) + 3 = 6 + 3 = 9 Triple ( 3 ) + 1 = 9 + 1 = 10 Triple the last digit ( 1 ) 1 5 8 9 10 3 159003 111 x 13 = - - - - Copy the first digit 1 Triple ( 1 ) + 1 = 3 + 1 = 4 Triple the last digit ( 1 )3 1 4 4 3 1443

Multiplying using base 10 8 x 7 = - ، Example ( 2 ) : ، Example ( 3 ) : Example ( 4 ) : Example ( 1 ) : - 2- 3 7 – 2 = 5 2 x 3 = 6 5 6 8 – 3 = 5 2 x 3 = 6 5 6 9 x 6 = - 9 – 4 = 5 - 1 - 4 1 x 4 = 4 5 4 6 – 1 = 5 1 x 4 = 4 5 4 7 x 4 = - - 3 - 6 4 – 3 = 1 3 x 6 = 1 8 2 8 7 – 6 = 1 3 x 6 = 1 8 2 8 2 x 3 = - ، - 8-7 2 – 7 = - 5 8 x 7 = 56 6 ، 3 – 8 = - 5 8 x 7 = 56 6

Example ( 1 ) : Example ( 2 ) : Example ( 3 ) : How to multiply a number by 5 36 x5= x5= Example ( 4 ) : x5 = The trick is : divide by 2Multiply by 10 =- - - 24x5 = ÷ ÷ ÷ ÷ ÷ 2 = = = = = 1212 x 10 = 120 3621818 x 10 = 180 12 2 66 x 10 = 60 15 27.5 7.5 x 10 = 75 Example ( 5 ) : 18x5 2= 99 x 10 = 90

Example ( 1 ) : Example ( 2 ) : Example ( 3 ) : Example ( 4 ) : Divide a number by 5 24÷5= 24 + 24 = 484. 8 36÷5= + =727. 2 12÷5= 12 + 12 = 242. 4 73÷5= 73 + 73 = 146 14. 6 Example ( 5 ) : 67÷5 = 67 + 67 = 134 13. 4

Convert from Centigrade to Fahrenheit Example ( 2 ) : Example ( 3 ) : Example ( 1 ) : 22 ° C ° F - - - 22 + 22 = 44 44 + 30 = 74 22 ° C° F74 32 ° C ° F - - - 32 + 32 = 64 64 + 30 = 94 32 ° C 94 ° F 19 ° C- - -° F 19 + 19 = 38 38 + 30 = 68 19 ° C° F68

Download ppt "Example ( 1 ) : ( 1 2 ) 2 = - - - 1 2 + 2 = 14 ، 2 x 2 = 4 1 4 4 Example ( 2 ) : ( 1 3 ) 2 = - - - 1 3 + 3 = 16،3 x 3 = 9 1 6 9 Example ( 3 ) : ("

Similar presentations