Download presentation

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Published byHarry Swallow Modified over 2 years ago

1
Presented by Barb Pecoraro

2
26 x37 54 x 97 = 81* 62 =

4
Traditional Partial Products Lattice Your Own Method I am confused

5
43 x 27 21 280 60 + 800 1,161 Do you recognize this method? I am confused.

6
2 43 x 27 301 + 860 1,161 Do you recognize this method? Did your parents try to teach you this method? I am more confused.

7
43 2 7 6 0 2 1 0 8 2 8 1 6 1 1 Do you recognize this method? What?

10
25 x 36 30 (6 x 5)

11
25 x 36 30 (6 x 5) 120 (6 x 20)

12
25 x 36 30 (6 x 5) 120 (6 x 20) 150 (30 x 5)

13
25 x 36 30 (6 x 5) 120 (6 x 20) 150 (30 x 5) 600 (30 x 20)

14
25 x 36 30 (6 x 5) 120 (6 x 20) 150 (30 x 5) + 600 (30 x 20)

15
25 x 36 30 (6 x 5) 120 (6 x 20) 150 (30 x 5) + 600 (30 x 20) 900

16
25 x 36 30 (6 x 5) 120 (6 x 20) 150 (30 x 5) + 600 (30 x 20) 900

17
25 x 36 30 (6 x 5) 120 (6 x 20) 150 (30 x 5) + 600 (30 x 20) 900

19
3 25 x 36 0 (6 x 5 = 30) Write the 0, regroup 3

20
3 25 x 36 150 (6 x 5 = 30) Write the 0, regroup 3 ( (6 x 2) + 3 = 15)

21
3 25 x 36 150 (6 x 5 = 30) Write the 0, regroup 3 0 ( (6 x 2) + 3 = 15) Write a 0; Cross out 3

22
1 3 25 x 36 150 (6 x 5 = 30) Write the 0, regroup 3 50 ( (6 x 2) + 3 = 15) Write a 0; Cross out 3 (3 x 5 = 15) Write the 5; regroup 1

23
1 3 25 x 36 150 (6 x 5 = 30) Write the 0, regroup 3 750 ( (6 x 2) + 3 = 15) Write a 0; Cross out 3 (3 x 5 = 15) Write the 5; regroup 1 ( (3 x 2) + 1 = 7) Write the 7

24
1 3 25 x 36 150 (6 x 5 = 30) Write the 0, regroup 3 750 ( (6 x 2) + 3 = 15) 900 Write a 0; Cross out 3 (3 x 5 = 15) Write the 5; regroup 1 ( (3 x 2) + 1 = 7) Write the 7 Add

25
1 3 25 x 36 150 (6 x 5 = 30) Write the 0, regroup 3 750 ( (6 x 2) + 3 = 15) 900 Write a 0; Cross out 3 (3 x 5 = 15) Write the 5; regroup 1 ( (3 x 2) + 1 = 7) Write the 7 Add

26
1 3 25 x 36 150 (6 x 5 = 30) Write the 0, regroup 3 750 ( (6 x 2) + 3 = 15) 900 Write a 0; Cross out 3 (3 x 5 = 15) Write the 5; regroup 1 ( (3 x 2) + 1 = 7) Write the 7 Add

28
Draw the lattice grid.

29
Write the two factors. 25 3 6

30
Multiply the red digits. 25 3 6 1 5

31
Multiply the green digits. 25 3 6 1 5 0 6

32
Multiply the blue digits. 25 3 6 1 5 0 6 3 0

33
Multiply the purple digits. 25 3 6 1 5 0 6 3 0 1 2

34
Add the digits in the lane with the thin arrow. 25 3 6 1 5 0 6 3 0 1 2 0 Start here.

35
Add the digits in the lane with the arrow. 25 3 6 1 5 0 6 3 0 1 2 00 1

36
Add the digits in the lane with arrow. 25 3 6 1 5 0 6 3 0 1 2 00 1 Regroup one group of ten in next lane.

37
Add the digits in the lane with the arrow. 25 3 6 1 5 0 6 3 0 1 2 00 1 9

38
25 3 6 1 5 0 6 3 0 1 2 00 1 9 The product is 900.

39
25 3 6 1 5 0 6 3 0 1 2 00 1 9

40
25 3 6 1 5 0 6 3 0 1 2 00 1 9

41
Repeated Addition

42
62 x 15

43
62 x 15 10 (5 x 2) 20 (10 x 2) 300 (5 x 60) +600 (10 x 60) 930

44
62 x 15 310 +620 930

45
62 1 5 0 2 1 0 0 6 3 0 9 30

48
http://www.superteacherworksheets.com/lattice/lattice2.pdf Lattice grid

Similar presentations

© 2017 SlidePlayer.com Inc.

All rights reserved.

Ads by Google