Download presentation

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Published byAyden Thaxton Modified over 3 years ago

1
Multiply By Two Digits Created by M. Guy

2
- 3.A.1.a Use technology tools, including software and hardware, from a range of teacher-selected options to learn new content or reinforce skills. Maryland Technology Literacy Student Standard (MTLSS) Maryland VSC Standard -6.C.1.c - Multiply whole numbers Our Standards

3
Let’s Review Factors- Numbers multiplied together Product- The answer in a multiplication equation

4
Two Digit Multiplication 26 x12 The first step is to make sure the place values are lined up. OnesTens

5
Two Digit Multiplication 26 x12 Begin with multiplying the bottom factor’s one’s place with the top factors one’s place. Think, 2 x 6 equals 12. Because there is still the tens place to multiply, you must carry the 1. 2 1

6
Two Digit Multiplication 26 x12 Next, multiply the 2 and the other 2. Then, remember to add your carry of 1. Think, 2x2=4+1=5 2 1 5

7
Two Digit Multiplication 26 x12 Next, because we are going to the next place value (tens), we need to use a 0 for a place holder. Place the 0 under the 2 in the products line. Erase your carry from before. 2 1 5 0

8
Two Digit Multiplication 26 x12 Next, begin to multiply the 1in the tens place with the top line factor. Think 1x6=6. 25 06

9
Two Digit Multiplication 26 x12 Think 1x2=2. 25 062

10
Two Digit Multiplication 26 x12 Finally, add the two product lines to find the final product. 25 062+ 213 1 Add the ones place. Carry is necessary. Add the tens place. Carry is necessary. Add the hundreds place. Carry is necessary.

11
The product is 312

12
34 x 19 34 x 19 1. 656 2. 646 3. 677 4. No of these 1234567891011121314151617181920212223242526272829303132

13
Two Digit Multiplication 34 x19 60 0 43 + 646 3 3

14
54 x 23 54 x 23 1. 1,242 2. 1,244 3. 1,342 4. 1,142 1234567891011121314151617181920212223242526272829303132

15
Two Digit Multiplication 54 x23 26 0 8 10 + 242 1 1 1

16
41 x 18 41 x 18 1. 748 2. 778 3. 738 4. 728 1234567891011121314151617181920212223242526272829303132

17
Two Digit Multiplication 41 x18 82 0 1 4 + 837 3

18
68 x 35 68 x 35 1. 2,370 2. 2,345 3. 3,270 4. 2,380 1234567891011121314151617181920212223242526272829303132

19
Two Digit Multiplication 68 x35 04 0 4 20 + 083 4 3 2 2

20
76 x 52 76 x 52 1. 3,952 2. 4,952 3. 3,852 4. 3,552 1234567891011121314151617181920212223242526272829303132

21
Two Digit Multiplication 76 x52 25 0 0 38 + 259 1 1 3 3

22
94 x 76 94 x 76 1. 7,044 2. 7,144 3. 6,044 4. 6,244 1234567891011121314151617181920212223242526272829303132

23
Two Digit Multiplication 94 x76 46 0 8 65 + 441 2 5 7 2

Similar presentations

OK

Multiply By Two Digits. Let’s Review Factors- Numbers multiplied together Product- The answer in a multiplication equation.

Multiply By Two Digits. Let’s Review Factors- Numbers multiplied together Product- The answer in a multiplication equation.

© 2018 SlidePlayer.com Inc.

All rights reserved.

Ads by Google

Ppt on earth day 2013 Ppt on second law of thermodynamics definition Ppt on infrared sensor Ppt on building information modeling software Ppt on fibonacci numbers stock Ppt on any one mathematician turing Ppt on types of distribution channels Ppt on anti rigging voting system Ppt on beer lambert law spectrophotometry Ppt on campus recruitment training