Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Multiplying Large Numbers (Traditional Method) Created by: Sabrina Edmondson Adapted from BBC online.

Similar presentations


Presentation on theme: "Multiplying Large Numbers (Traditional Method) Created by: Sabrina Edmondson Adapted from BBC online."— Presentation transcript:

1 Multiplying Large Numbers (Traditional Method) Created by: Sabrina Edmondson Adapted from BBC online

2 Multiplying Large Numbers If this method seems familiar it might be because you were encouraged to use it in school. Talking through the method is far easier than trying to follow written instructions.

3 Multiplying Large Numbers Have a look at how the equation 235 x 5 can be worked out using this method. Step 1: 5 x 5 = 25. Put the 5 in the units column, and carry the 2 to the tens. HTO 2 235 x5 5

4 Multiplying Large Numbers Step 2: 3 x 5 = 15. Add the 2 makes 17. 7 goes into the ten’s column and carry the 1 to the hundred’s column. HTO 12 235 x5 75

5 Multiplying Large Numbers Step 3: 5 x 2 = 10. Add the carried 1 makes 11. Th HTO 12 235 x5 1 75 So: 235 x 5 = 1,175

6 Multiplying Large Numbers  Remember to line up the ones, tens and hundreds underneath each other.

7 Multiplying Large Numbers Now have a look at the equation: 255 x 25 HTO 255 x25

8 Multiplying Large Numbers First, multiply 255 by the unit digit 5. Step 1: 5 x 5 = 25. Put the 5 in the units column, and carry the 2 to the tens HTO 2 255 x25 5

9 Multiplying Large Numbers HTO 22 255 x25 75 Step 2: 5 x 5 = 25. Add the 2 makes 27. 7 goes into the tens column and carry the 2 to the hundred’s column.

10 Multiplying Large Numbers Step 3: 5 x 2 = 10. Add the carried 2 makes 12. Th HTO 22 255 x25 1 275

11 Multiplying Large Numbers Then multiply 255 by the ten’s digit 2. Remember to place a zero in the ones column first when multiplying the tens. Th HTO 255 x25 1 275 0

12 Multiplying Large Numbers Th HTO 1 255 x25 1 275 00 Step 1: 2 x 5 = 10. Put the 0 in the ten’s column, and carry the 1 to the hundreds.

13 Multiplying Large Numbers Step 2: 2 x 5 = 10. Add the carried 1 makes 11. 1 goes into the hundred’s column, with 1 carried to the thousands. Th HTO 11 255 x25 1 275 100

14 Multiplying Large Numbers Step 3: 2 x 2 = 4, add the carried 1 makes 5. The total is 5,100. Th HTO 11 255 x25 1 275 5 100

15 Multiplying Large Numbers Finally, add down the columns down to get the total. Th HTO 11 255 x25 1 275 5 100 6 375 So: 255 x 25 = 6,375

16 Multiplying Large Numbers Remember:  Keep the numbers in columns - ones, tens, hundreds etc.  When multiplying the tens digit add a zero to the ones column first.


Download ppt "Multiplying Large Numbers (Traditional Method) Created by: Sabrina Edmondson Adapted from BBC online."

Similar presentations


Ads by Google