Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

How do you multiply 512 x 46? Those are really big numbers!

Similar presentations


Presentation on theme: "How do you multiply 512 x 46? Those are really big numbers!"— Presentation transcript:

1 How do you multiply 512 x 46? Those are really big numbers!

2 In this lesson you will learn how to multiply multi-digit numbers by using the standard algorithm.

3 Let’s Review Product – The result when two numbers are multiplied. For Example: 4 x 5 = 20 product

4 Multiplication is repeated addition x 5 Multiplication is faster!

5 Multiplying by powers of x 10 = x 100 = 3, x 1,000 = 36,000

6 A Common Mistake Multiplying each digit as if it represents a number of “ones.” It is important to remember the place value of each digit. 36 x 5 = 30 x x 5

7 Let’s Review Core Lesson Multiply 512 x x 46 First, we need to multiply 512 by 6. Then we need to multiply 512 by 40.

8 Let’s Review Core Lesson 512 x Adding a zero shows that we are multiplying by 10’s ,552 Next, we add the partial products.

9 Let’s Review Core Lesson 405 x Adding a zero shows that we are multiplying by 10’s ,085 Next, we add the partial products. 2

10 In this lesson you have learned how to multiply multi-digit numbers by using the standard algorithm.

11 Let’s Review Guided Practice Multiply 422 x 18.

12 Let’s Review Extension Activities Write a real world problem that could be solved by using 32 x 12.

13 Let’s Review Extension Activities Every student received 24 pencils. If there are 20 students in my class, how many pencils did we have in all?

14 Let’s Review Extension Activities Write a multiplication equation that has a product of 3,600.

15 Let’s Review Quick Quiz Multiply 290 x 73.

16 Let’s Review Quick Quiz Multiply 64 x 48.


Download ppt "How do you multiply 512 x 46? Those are really big numbers!"

Similar presentations


Ads by Google