Download presentation

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Published byNora Medd Modified over 4 years ago

1
We can multiply bigger numbers using an algorithm! www.classroom-teacher-resources.com

2
Calculate 50 X 60 67 X53 Calculate 50 X 7 21 180 350 3,000 Calculate 3 X 60 Calculate 3 X 7 + Add the results 3,551 To find 67 x 53, decompose the numbers! Think of 67 as 60 + 7 Think of 53 as 50 + 3. Multiply each part of 67 by each part of 53. Add the results Always start here www.classroom-teacher-resources.com

3
Calculate 40 x 80 82 X45 Calculate 40 x 2 10 400 80 3,200 Calculate 5 x 80 Calculate 5 x 2 + Add the results 3,690 Let’s try another one! Always start here www.classroom-teacher-resources.com

4
= 10 x 20 26 X18 = 10 x 6 48 160 60 200 = 8 x 20 = 8 x 6 + Add the results 468 Try this on your own! www.classroom-teacher-resources.com

5
81 X53 Let’s try one more! www.classroom-teacher-resources.com

Similar presentations

Presentation is loading. Please wait....

OK

Number bonds to 10, 20 + 100.

Number bonds to 10, 20 + 100.

© 2018 SlidePlayer.com Inc.

All rights reserved.

To make this website work, we log user data and share it with processors. To use this website, you must agree to our Privacy Policy, including cookie policy.

Ads by Google