Download presentation

Presentation is loading. Please wait.

Published byDanny Siers Modified over 3 years ago

1
TEACHING WRITTEN CALCULATIONS St. Augustine’s Catholic Primary

2
Introduction Common approach – so the children don’t get confused Mainly start recording fromY1 onwards Stages relate to year groups but not all children at year group level Cover all calculations today – am available afterwards, or speak to class teacher Presentation on school website

3
ADDITION Stage 1 –Teachers demonstrate number lines 8 + 5 = 13 0 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13

4
Stage 2 – Children use empty number lines starting with the largest number and counting on 34+23 = 57 344454 55 56 57 344454 57 3454 57

5
Stage 3 Make sure children count from largest number first. Example 38 + 86 = swap to 86 + 38 =

6
Children begin to work in columns 67 +24 11(7+4) 80(60 +20) 91

7
Stage 4 – Children begin to carry below the line 783 +42 825 1

8
Stages 5 and 6 Children use larger numbers Children use decimal numbers

9
Have a go!! How would you use a number line to demonstrate 28 + 54 = Use the column method to calculate 345 + 67 =

10
SUBTRACTION Stage 1 – Teachers demonstrate number lines 13 – 5 = 8 0 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 1011 12 131415

11
Stage 2 – Children use empty number lines 47-23 = 24 25 26 273747 24273747 242747

12
Counting on 82-47 = 47 48 49 50607080 81 82

13
Stage 3 – Children use column method 71 – 46 = 701 -406

14
Stages 4,5 and 6 – Larger numbers, leading to short method 754 -286

15
Have a go!! How would you use a number line to demonstrate 58 – 24 = Use the short column method to calculate 654 – 482 =

16
MULTIPLICATION – Stage 1 and 2 Children must understand that multiplication is repeated addition 5x3 =5+5+5 051015

17
Need to understand that: 3x5 is the same as 5x3 03691215

18
Stages 3 and 4 – Children continue to use number lines and arrays X104 6

19
Grid method 23 x 8 = x203 816024 160 +24 184

20
Short method 38 x 7 = 38 x7 266 5

21
Grid method for TU X TU X506 201000120 735042 1350162 1350 +162 1512 1

22
Stages 5 and 6 – Short method 56 x 27 = Children approximate first: 60 x 30 = 1800 56 X27 39256x7 112056x20 1512 1

23
Have a go!!! Use the grid method to calculate 43 x 6 Try the short method Calculate 56 x 43 using the grid method and short method

24
DIVISION – Stage 1 and 2 – Children understand that division is repeated subtraction - 4 groups of 3 in 12 12 3 = 4 0 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13

25
Stage 3 – Children continue to use repeated addition on number lines including remainders 13 4 = 3 r 1 0 15913

26
Stage 4 – Short division using chunking method 72 3 = 24 3)72 - 30 10 x 42 - 3010 x 12 - 62 x 6 62 x Answer = 24 0

27
Stages 5 and 6 – Children use larger multiples and numbers 864 24 = 36 24)864 - 72030 x 144 - 723 x 72 - 723 x Answer = 36 0

28
Other Year 6 methods Please look at the leaflets/website. These are used if children are having difficulties with the chunking method

29
Have a go!! Use a number line to demonstrate 14 7 = 2 Use the chunking method to work out 65 5 = 210 15 =

Similar presentations

OK

Multiplication X 1 1 x 1 = 1 2 x 1 = 2 3 x 1 = 3 4 x 1 = 4 5 x 1 = 5 6 x 1 = 6 7 x 1 = 7 8 x 1 = 8 9 x 1 = 9 10 x 1 = 10 11 x 1 = 11 12 x 1 = 12 X 2 1.

Multiplication X 1 1 x 1 = 1 2 x 1 = 2 3 x 1 = 3 4 x 1 = 4 5 x 1 = 5 6 x 1 = 6 7 x 1 = 7 8 x 1 = 8 9 x 1 = 9 10 x 1 = 10 11 x 1 = 11 12 x 1 = 12 X 2 1.

© 2018 SlidePlayer.com Inc.

All rights reserved.

Ads by Google

Ppt on dth service free download Ppt on building information modeling training Ppt on safe abortion Flexible display ppt on ipad Ppt on object-oriented programming concepts in java Ppt on file security system Ppt on current account deficit united Ppt on 5g wireless system Ppt on arithmetic micro operations Ppt on primary and secondary market