Multiply By Two Digits. Let’s Review Factors- Numbers multiplied together Product- The answer in a multiplication equation.

Presentation on theme: "Multiply By Two Digits. Let’s Review Factors- Numbers multiplied together Product- The answer in a multiplication equation."— Presentation transcript:

Multiply By Two Digits

Let’s Review Factors- Numbers multiplied together Product- The answer in a multiplication equation

Two Digit Multiplication 26 x12 The first step is to make sure the place values are lined up. OnesTens

Two Digit Multiplication 26 x12 Begin with multiplying the bottom factor’s one’s place with the top factors one’s place. Think, 2 x 6 equals 12. Because there is still the tens place to multiply, you must carry the 1. 2 1

Two Digit Multiplication 26 x12 Next, multiply the 2 and the other 2. Then, remember to add your carry of 1. Think, 2x2=4+1=5 2 1 5

Two Digit Multiplication 26 x12 Next, because we are going to the next place value (tens), we need to use a 0 for a place holder. Place the 0 under the 2 in the products line. Erase your carry from before. 2 1 5 0

Two Digit Multiplication 26 x12 Next, begin to multiply the 1in the tens place with the top line factor. Think 1x6=6. 25 06

Two Digit Multiplication 26 x12 Think 1x2=2. 25 062

Two Digit Multiplication 26 x12 Finally, add the two product lines to find the final product. 25 062+ 213 1 Add the ones place. Carry if necessary. Add the tens place. Carry is necessary. Add the hundreds place. Carry if necessary.

The product is 312

34 x 19 34 x 19 1. 656 2. 646 3. 677 4. No of these

Two Digit Multiplication 34 x19 60 0 43 + 646 3 3

54 x 23 54 x 23 1. 1,242 2. 1,244 3. 1,342 4. 1,142

Two Digit Multiplication 54 x23 26 0 8 10 + 242 1 1 1

41 x 18 41 x 18 1. 748 2. 778 3. 738 4. 728

Two Digit Multiplication 41 x18 82 0 1 4 + 837 3

68 x 35 68 x 35 1. 2,370 2. 2,345 3. 3,270 4. 2,380

Two Digit Multiplication 68 x35 04 0 4 20 + 083 4 3 2 2

76 x 52 76 x 52 1. 3,952 2. 4,952 3. 3,852 4. 3,552

Two Digit Multiplication 76 x52 25 0 0 38 + 259 1 1 3 3

94 x 76 94 x 76 1. 7,044 2. 7,144 3. 6,044 4. 6,244

Two Digit Multiplication 94 x76 46 0 8 65 + 441 2 5 7 2

Similar presentations